Tienda v. Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC

Plaintiff: Juan Tienda
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv04621
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sim Lake
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Filing 9 Opposed REPLY to Response to #7 Opposed MOTION to Remand, filed by Juan Tienda. (Nettels, Bryan)
January 15, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #7 Opposed MOTION to Remand filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hebert, Stephen)
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 Opposed MOTION to Remand by Juan Tienda, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order)(Nettels, Bryan)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Juan Tienda, filed.(Nettels, Bryan)
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, filed.(Ramirez, John)
December 11, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, filed.(Ramirez, John)
December 11, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ramirez, John)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/22/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 127th District Court, Harris County, case number 2018-78996 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21422746) filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition, #3 Exhibit Original Answer (State Court), #4 Exhibit Jury Demand (State Court))(Ramirez, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tienda v. Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Tienda
Represented By: Bryan Christopher Nettels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC
Represented By: John A. Ramirez
Represented By: Stephen Albert Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?