Hamilton v. The Bank of New York Mellon et al

Plaintiff: Hyman Hamilton
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon FKA The Bank of New York, as Trustee (CWALT 2004-32CB), Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC and The Bank of New York Mellon
Case Number: 4:2018cv04639
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Setting as to #5 Notice of Settlement. Parties notified. Status Conference set for 3/22/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett, filed. (ledwards, 4)
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Settlement by Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon, filed. (Shirazi, Sahar)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by The Bank of New York Mellon, filed.(Shirazi, Sahar)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 Amended CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon, filed.(Shirazi, Sahar)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/5/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 458th Judicial District Court of Fort Bend County, Texas, case number 18-DCV-256635 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21429015) filed by Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon FKA The Bank of New York, as Trustee (CWALT 2004-32CB). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit D-1, #6 Exhibit D-2, #7 Exhibit D-3, #8 Exhibit D-4, #9 Exhibit E)(Shirazi, Sahar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton v. The Bank of New York Mellon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hyman Hamilton
Represented By: Joshua David Gordon
Represented By: Robert Chamless Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon FKA The Bank of New York, as Trustee (CWALT 2004-32CB)
Represented By: Sahar Haidari Shirazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Sahar Haidari Shirazi
Represented By: Nicola Marie Shiels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Nicola Marie Shiels
Represented By: Sahar Haidari Shirazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?