Amazing Lash Franchise, LLC v. Nguyen et al
Plaintiff: Amazing Lash Franchise, LLC
Defendant: 10927 Amazing Vintage Park, LLC, 1923 Amazing Sawyer Heights, Scott D Nguyen, 6501 Amazing Grand Lakes Katy, LLC, 1415 Amazing Voss, LLC, 2621 Amzaing River Oaks, LLC, 9650 Amazing Woodlake, LLC and Hawthorne Heights, LLC
Intervenor: Lan Nguyen, Trung Nguyen, The Nail Lounge, Inc. and TCN Victory, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv04671
Filed: December 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Nancy F Atlas
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2020 Filing 50 STATUS REPORT by Scott D Nguyen, filed.(Johnson, Millard)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER STAYING AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. Case terminated on 2/6/2020(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
August 2, 2019 Filing 48 ANSWER to #28 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by 10927 Amazing Vintage Park, LLC, 1415 Amazing Voss, LLC, 1923 Amazing Sawyer Heights, 2621 Amzaing River Oaks, LLC, 6501 Amazing Grand Lakes Katy, LLC, 9650 Amazing Woodlake, LLC, Hawthorne Heights, LLC, Scott D Nguyen, filed.(Johnson, Millard)
August 2, 2019 Filing 47 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by 10927 Amazing Vintage Park, LLC, 1415 Amazing Voss, LLC, 1923 Amazing Sawyer Heights, 2621 Amzaing River Oaks, LLC, 6501 Amazing Grand Lakes Katy, LLC, 9650 Amazing Woodlake, LLC, Hawthorne Heights, LLC, Scott D Nguyen, filed.(Johnson, Millard)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
July 18, 2019 Filing 45 REPLY in Support of #42 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by 10927 Amazing Vintage Park, LLC, 1415 Amazing Voss, LLC, 1923 Amazing Sawyer Heights, 2621 Amzaing River Oaks, LLC, 6501 Amazing Grand Lakes Katy, LLC, 9650 Amazing Woodlake, LLC, Hawthorne Heights, LLC, Scott D Nguyen. (Johnson, Millard)
July 12, 2019 Filing 44 PROPOSED ORDER Denying Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss, filed.(McGuire, Daniel)
July 11, 2019 Filing 43 RESPONSE in Opposition to #42 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Amazing Lash Franchise, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit attachment)(McGuire, Daniel)
June 20, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION to Dismiss by 10927 Amazing Vintage Park, LLC, 1415 Amazing Voss, LLC, 1923 Amazing Sawyer Heights, 2621 Amzaing River Oaks, LLC, 6501 Amazing Grand Lakes Katy, LLC, 9650 Amazing Woodlake, LLC, Hawthorne Heights, LLC, Scott D Nguyen, filed. (Johnson, Millard)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Pretrial conference held Appearances: Stacy Fisher, Christi Condara. Appearances: Millard A Johnson, Paul S Francis, Bradley K Jones, Benjamin Witten Allen. Ct Reporter: ERO. Docket control order to follow.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 SCHEDULING ORDER. ETT: 4-5 days. Jury. Amended Pleadings due by 7/31/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 7/31/2019 Pltf Expert Report due by 10/25/2019. Deft Expert Report due by 12/20/2019. Discovery due by 3/21/2020. Mediation due by 12/31/2019. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 4/30/2020. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 4/30/2020. Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/29/2020. Docket Call set for 7/15/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
June 3, 2019 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by 10927 Amazing Vintage Park, LLC, 1415 Amazing Voss, LLC, 1923 Amazing Sawyer Heights, 2621 Amzaing River Oaks, LLC, 6501 Amazing Grand Lakes Katy, LLC, 9650 Amazing Woodlake, LLC, Hawthorne Heights, LLC, Scott D Nguyen, filed.(Johnson, Millard)
June 3, 2019 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Amazing Lash Franchise, LLC, filed.(Jones, Bradley)
June 3, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference set for 6/4/2019 at 01:00 PM (TIME CHANGE ONLY) in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas, filed. (sashabranner, 4)
May 31, 2019 Filing 36 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by 10927 Amazing Vintage Park, LLC, 1415 Amazing Voss, LLC, 1923 Amazing Sawyer Heights, 2621 Amzaing River Oaks, LLC, 6501 Amazing Grand Lakes Katy, LLC, 9650 Amazing Woodlake, LLC, Hawthorne Heights, LLC, Scott D Nguyen, filed.(Johnson, Millard)
May 28, 2019 Filing 35 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Amazing Lash Franchise, LLC, filed.(Jones, Bradley)
May 20, 2019 Filing 34 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Amazing Lash Franchise, LLC, filed.(Jones, Bradley)
May 8, 2019 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to 10927 Amazing Vintage Park, LLC served on 4/24/2019, answer due 6/24/2019; 1415 Amazing Voss, LLC served on 4/24/2019, answer due 6/24/2019; 1923 Amazing Sawyer Heights served on 4/24/2019, answer due 6/24/2019; 2621 Amzaing River Oaks, LLC served on 4/24/2019, answer due 6/24/2019; 6501 Amazing Grand Lakes Katy, LLC served on 4/24/2019, answer due 6/24/2019; 9650 Amazing Woodlake, LLC served on 4/24/2019, answer due 6/24/2019; Hawthorne Heights, LLC served on 4/24/2019, answer due 6/24/2019; Scott D Nguyen served on 4/24/2019, answer due 6/24/2019, filed.(Jones, Bradley)
May 3, 2019 Filing 32 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summon, #2 Summon, #3 Summon, #4 Summon, #5 Summon, #6 Summon)(hlerma, 4)
May 1, 2019 Filing 31 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Amazing Lash Franchise, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 River Oaks, #2 Sawyer Heights, #3 Voss, #4 Woodlake, #5 Vintage Park, #6 Grand Lakes Katy)(Jones, Bradley)
April 24, 2019 Filing 30 Summons Issued as to Hawthorne Heights, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
April 22, 2019 Filing 29 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Hawthorne Heights, LLC, filed.(Jones, Bradley)
April 22, 2019 Filing 28 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Amazing Lash Franchise, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1, #2 Ex. 2, #3 Ex. 3, #4 Ex. 4, #5 Ex. 5, #6 Ex. 6, #7 Ex. 7, #8 Ex. 8, #9 Ex. 9, #10 Ex. 10)(Jones, Bradley)
April 19, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Resetting as to #26 Letter. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 6/4/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas, filed. (sashabranner, 4)
April 19, 2019 Filing 26 Letter from Bradley K. Jones re: Request to Reset Conference, filed. (sashabranner, 4)
April 17, 2019 Filing 25 ADVISORY by Lan Nguyen, filed.(Wheelock, Jeffrey)
January 15, 2019 Filing 24 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Scott D Nguyen served on 1/5/2019, answer due 1/28/2019, filed.(mxperez, 5)
January 15, 2019 Filing 23 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to 1923 Amazing Sawyer Heights served on 1/8/2019, answer due 1/29/2019, filed.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
January 15, 2019 Filing 22 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to 10927 Amazing Vintage Park, LLC served on 1/8/2019, answer due 1/29/2019, filed.(mxperez, 5)
January 15, 2019 Filing 21 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to 6501 Amazing Grand Lakes Katy, LLC served on 1/8/2019, answer due 1/29/2019, filed.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
January 15, 2019 Filing 20 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to 1415 Amazing Voss, LLC served on 1/8/2019, answer due 1/29/2019, filed.(mxperez, 5)
January 15, 2019 Filing 19 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to 2621 Amzaing River Oaks, LLC served on 1/8/2019, answer due 1/29/2019, filed.(mxperez, 5)
January 15, 2019 Filing 18 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to 9650 Amazing Woodlake, LLC served on 1/8/2019, answer due 1/29/2019, filed.(JenniferLongoria, 1) Modified on 1/16/2019 (JenniferLongoria, 1).
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTED #16 Status Report. The January 23, 2019, preliminary injunction hearing is CANCELLED.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
January 14, 2019 Filing 16 STATUS REPORT by Amazing Lash Franchise, LLC, filed.(Jones, Bradley)
December 27, 2018 Filing 15 ADVISORY by Trung Nguyen, TCN Victory, Inc., The Nail Lounge, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smittick, Shannon)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Motion Hearing held.Plaintiffs Motion for Temporary Restraining Order [Doc. # 3] iswithdrawn. Motions to Intervene [Docs. # 12 and # 13] are granted in part. Movants are permitted to intervene as Parties in Interest. Each Movant must file by December 27, 2018, an Advisory stating their positions on all claims asserted by Plaintiff. ( Status Report due by 1/14/2019, Injunction Hearing set for 1/23/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas) Appearances: David Tang for Defendant, Christie Condara for Interested Party Lan Nguyen. Appearances: Paul S Francis, Benjamin Witten Allen. Ct Reporter: ERO. (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
December 20, 2018 Filing 13 EMERGENCY MOTION, MOTION to Intervene( Motion Docket Date 1/10/2019.) by Lan Nguyen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Motion and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Wheelock, Jeffrey)
December 20, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Intervene by Trung Nguyen, The Nail Lounge, Inc., TCN Victory, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Allen, Benjamin)
December 20, 2018 Summons Issued as to 10927 Amazing Vintage Park, LLC, 1415 Amazing Voss, LLC, 1923 Amazing Sawyer Heights, 2621 Amzaing River Oaks, LLC, 6501 Amazing Grand Lakes Katy, LLC, 9650 Amazing Woodlake, LLC, Scott D Nguyen. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(jdav, 4)
December 19, 2018 Filing 11 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Amazing Lash Franchise, LLC, filed.(Jones, Bradley)
December 19, 2018 Filing 10 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Amazing Lash Franchise, LLC, filed.(Jones, Bradley)
December 19, 2018 Filing 9 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Amazing Lash Franchise, LLC, filed.(Jones, Bradley)
December 19, 2018 Filing 8 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Amazing Lash Franchise, LLC, filed.(Jones, Bradley)
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Amazing Lash Franchise, LLC, filed.(Jones, Bradley)
December 19, 2018 Filing 6 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Amazing Lash Franchise, LLC, filed.(Jones, Bradley)
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Amazing Lash Franchise, LLC, filed.(Jones, Bradley)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. Motion-related deadline set re: #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Amazing Lash Franchise, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Ex. 1, #3 Ex. 2, #4 Ex. 3, #5 Ex. 4, #6 Ex. 5, #7 Ex. 6, #8 Ex. 7, #9 Ex. 8, #10 Ex. 9, #11 Ex. 10, #12 Proposed Order)(Jones, Bradley)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/22/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas. (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
December 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21447619) filed by Amazing Lash Franchise, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex 1, #3 Exhibit Ex 2, #4 Exhibit Ex 3, #5 Exhibit Ex 4, #6 Exhibit Ex 5, #7 Exhibit Ex 6, #8 Exhibit Ex 7, #9 Exhibit Ex 8, #10 Exhibit Ex 9)(Francis, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amazing Lash Franchise, LLC v. Nguyen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amazing Lash Franchise, LLC
Represented By: Paul S Francis
Represented By: Bradley K Jones
Represented By: Daniel D McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 10927 Amazing Vintage Park, LLC
Represented By: Millard A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1923 Amazing Sawyer Heights
Represented By: Millard A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott D Nguyen
Represented By: Millard A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 6501 Amazing Grand Lakes Katy, LLC
Represented By: Millard A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1415 Amazing Voss, LLC
Represented By: Millard A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2621 Amzaing River Oaks, LLC
Represented By: Millard A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 9650 Amazing Woodlake, LLC
Represented By: Millard A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawthorne Heights, LLC
Represented By: Millard A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Lan Nguyen
Represented By: Jeffrey William Wheelock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Trung Nguyen
Represented By: Benjamin Witten Allen
Represented By: Shannon Rashida Smittick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: The Nail Lounge, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Witten Allen
Represented By: Shannon Rashida Smittick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: TCN Victory, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Witten Allen
Represented By: Shannon Rashida Smittick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?