Nguyen v. Lacy

Petitioner: Lam Nguyen
Respondent: Robert Lacy, Jr., Jeff Sessions, Bret A Bradford and Kirstjen Nielsen
Case Number: 4:2018cv04675
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2018 Filing 7 Certified Mail Receipt Returned, executed on 12/28/2018 re: 4 Document(s) Sent, - receipt attached, access restricted to court users for privacy reasons -, filed. (SarahShelby, 4)
December 28, 2018 Filing 6 Certified Mail Receipt Returned, executed on 12/26/18 re: 4 Document(s) Sent, - receipt attached, access restricted to court users for privacy reasons -, filed. (nortiz, 5)
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 Certified Mail Receipt Returned as to Ryan Patrick, executed on 12/26/2018 [per USPS website] re: 4 Document(s) Sent, - receipt attached, access restricted to court users for privacy reasons -, filed. (SarahShelby, 4)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO ANSWER. Respondents must file answer or other response within 90 days of receipt of service. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
December 12, 2018 Filing fee: $5 re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, receipt number HOU084951, filed. (hlerma, 4)
December 12, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (rguerrero, 4)
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5) filed by Lam Nguyen.(rguerrero, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nguyen v. Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lam Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Lacy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeff Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bret A Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirstjen Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?