Ye v. Zhang et al
Plaintiff: Hui Ye
Defendant: Wing Lau, Xiang Zhang, NuTroFlo Limited Liability Company, DeltaFill Enterprises, Inc., Ubuddy Inc. and OnePurify Limited Liability Company
Cross Defendant: DeltaFill Express Global, LLC and Delta Fill Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2018cv04729
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Filing 28 Notice Regarding Initial Conference(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
February 5, 2019 Filing 27 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,, CROSSCLAIM against Delta Fill Incorporated, DeltaFill Express Global, LLC, COUNTERCLAIM against Hui Ye by Xiang Zhang, filed.(Esparza, Jacob)
February 5, 2019 Filing 26 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,, CROSSCLAIM against Delta Fill Incorporated, DeltaFill Express Global, LLC, COUNTERCLAIM against Hui Ye by Wing Lau, filed.(Esparza, Jacob)
February 1, 2019 Filing 25 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Henna Ghafoor for Transcript of 01/24/2019. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Nichole Forrest, filed. (Ghafoor, Henna)
February 1, 2019 Filing 24 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Henna Ghafoor for Transcript of 01/17/2019. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Laura Wells, filed. (Ghafoor, Henna)
February 1, 2019 Summons Issued as to Delta Fill Incorporated, DeltaFill Enterprises, Inc., DeltaFill Express Global, LLC, NuTroFlo Limited Liability Company, OnePurify Limited Liability Company, Ubuddy Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff in person, filed.(jguajardo, 4)
January 31, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/31/2019. For reasons stated on the record, the Court defers ruling on the disputed sale at this time. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 9/9/2019. Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/2/2019. Jury Trial set for 12/9/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison Appearances: Henna Ghafoor, Fan Chen, Kristie Widner Tobin.(Court Reporter: N. Forrest)(Law Clerk: H. Hughes), filed.(arrivera, 4)
January 29, 2019 Filing 23 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #22 Transcript, #21 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (hcarr, 4)
January 28, 2019 Filing 22 TRANSCRIPT re: Hearing held on January 17, 2019 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter/Transcriber Laura Wells. Ordering Party Mr. Jacob Esparza Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/29/2019., filed. (lwells, )
January 28, 2019 Filing 21 TRANSCRIPT re: Motion Hearing held on 1/24/19 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter/Transcriber Nichole Forrest, CRR, RDR, CRC. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/29/2019., filed. (NicholeForrest, )
January 25, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Status Conference set for 1/31/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, 4)
January 24, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. MOTION HEARING held on 1/24/2019. Argument heard on #17 Motion to Vacate. For reasons stated on the record, the Court will vacate the original injunction and enter a modified preliminary injunction. Appearances: Jacob Cortez Esparza, Henna Ghafoor, Fan Chen, Kristie Widner Tobin.(Court Reporter: N. Forrest)(Law Clerk: H. Hughes), filed.(arrivera, 4)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 MOTION to Vacate #14 Preliminary Injunction.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
January 24, 2019 Filing 18 MUTUAL AGREED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
January 24, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Vacate #14 Preliminary Injunction by Wing Lau, Xiang Zhang, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Esparza, Jacob)
January 22, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2019 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, 4)
January 18, 2019 Filing 14 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(kpicota, 4)
January 17, 2019 Filing 16 Additional EXHIBITS - 29a, 29b re: Motion Hearing, by Hui Ye, filed.(arrivera, 4)
January 17, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. MOTION HEARING held on 1/17/2019. Argument heard from Plaintiff on [Doc. No. 6] Motion for Preliminary Injunction. For reasons stated on the record, Plaintiffs Motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff is ordered to file a contractual bond with the Court. Appearances: Henna Ghafoor.(Court Reporter: L. Wells)(Law Clerk: H. Hughes), filed.(arrivera, 4)
January 17, 2019 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER -TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER re: #6 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,, filed.(Ghafoor, Henna)
January 17, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Resetting as to #7 MOTION to Expedite BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2019 at 05:30 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. TIME CHANGE ONLY. Parties may appear by phone. (arrivera, 4)
January 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Setting as to #7 MOTION to Expedite BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE. Parties notified. Motion Hearing reset for 1/17/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, 4)
January 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Setting as to #7 MOTION to Expedite BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, 4)
January 14, 2019 Filing 9 Amended CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hui Ye, filed.(Ghafoor, Henna)
January 12, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service Unexecuted as to Xiang Zhang re: Original Complaint, filed.(Ghafoor, Henna)
January 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Expedite BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE by Hui Ye, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/4/2019. (Ghafoor, Henna)
January 12, 2019 Filing 6 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Hui Ye. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit)(Ghafoor, Henna)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hui Ye, filed.(Ghafoor, Henna)
January 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 3/22/2019 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, 4)
January 2, 2019 Filing 3 First CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Hui Ye, filed.(Ghafoor, Henna)
December 20, 2018 Summons Issued as to Wing Lau, Xiang Zhang. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff in person, filed.(BrendaLacy, 4)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/13/2019 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21475150) filed by Hui Ye. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ghafoor, Henna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ye v. Zhang et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wing Lau
Represented By: Jacob Cortez Esparza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xiang Zhang
Represented By: Kristie Widner Tobin
Represented By: Jacob Cortez Esparza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NuTroFlo Limited Liability Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeltaFill Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ubuddy Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OnePurify Limited Liability Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hui Ye
Represented By: Henna Ghafoor
Represented By: Fan Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: DeltaFill Express Global, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Delta Fill Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?