Luong et al v. Wallace

Plaintiff: Chris Tran, John Luong and Lisa Tran
Defendant: Crosby Washinton Wallace
Case Number: 4:2018cv04739
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sim Lake
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF TRANSFER to United States Bankruptcy Court (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
December 19, 2018 Summons Issued as to Crosby Washinton Wallace. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(hlerma, 4)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE Certificate of Interested Persons by John Luong, Chris Tran, Lisa Tran, filed. (Peniche, Carlos)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to John Luong, Chris Tran, Lisa Tran, filed.(Peniche, Carlos)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by John Luong, Chris Tran, Lisa Tran, filed.(Peniche, Carlos)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/22/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Crosby Washinton Wallace (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21486648) filed by John Luong, Chris Tran, Lisa Tran. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Asset Purchase Agreement)(Peniche, Carlos)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luong et al v. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Tran
Represented By: Carlos A Peniche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Luong
Represented By: Carlos A Peniche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Tran
Represented By: Carlos A Peniche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crosby Washinton Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?