Sams et al v. Allstate Texas LLoyd's et al
Plaintiff: Kent Sams and Linda Sams
Defendant: Alisia Crawley, Allstate Texas LLoyd's, Jorde Pettigrew and Andrew Romano
Case Number: 4:2018cv04806
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to Adjuster Defendants, filed by Allstate Texas LLoyd's. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Valdez, Robert)
January 25, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Allstate Texas LLoyd's. (Valdez, Robert)
January 18, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Kent Sams, Linda Sams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sigman, Rene)
January 18, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to Adjuster Defendants filed by Kent Sams, Linda Sams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Sigman, Rene)
January 10, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Kent Sams, filed.(Sigman, Rene)
January 10, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Allstate Texas LLoyd's, filed.(Valdez, Robert)
December 28, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Allstate Texas LLoyd's, filed.(Valdez, Robert)
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Allstate Texas LLoyd's, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Petition)(Valdez, Robert)
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to Adjuster Defendants by Allstate Texas LLoyd's, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Petition, #2 Exhibit B - Election of Responsibility)(Valdez, Robert)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/6/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Zamora on behalf of Allstate Texas LLoyd's, filed. (Zamora, Mark)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 269th District Court, case number 201883017 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21523980) filed by Allstate Texas LLoyd's. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Valdez, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sams et al v. Allstate Texas LLoyd's et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent Sams
Represented By: Rene M Sigman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Sams
Represented By: Rene M Sigman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alisia Crawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Texas LLoyd's
Represented By: Mark Anthony Zamora
Represented By: Robert Edward Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorde Pettigrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?