Fernandez v. Equiniti Trust Company et al

Plaintiff: Jose A Fernandez
Defendant: The Sherwin-Williams Company, Equiniti Trust Company d/b/a EQ Shareowner Services, Computershare Trust Company, N.A. and Equiniti Trust Company
Case Number: 4:2018cv04830
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Vanessa D Gilmore
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. This cause is hereby DISMISSED on the merits without prejudice to the right of counsel to move for reinstatement of this action within ninety (90) days if settlement is not consummated. FURTHERMORE, the Court shall retain jurisdiction to enforce the settlement agreement in its discretion upon an appropriate motion made within ninety (90) days of this Order. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
February 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Settlement by Jose A Fernandez, filed. (Taaffe, Peter)
January 17, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Computershare Trust Company, N.A. identifying Computershare, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Klein, Daniel)
January 17, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Equiniti Trust Company, The Sherwin-Williams Company, filed.(Bluebond, Andrew)
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Jose A Fernandez, filed.(Taaffe, Peter)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 Joint RESPONSE to #6 Order to Show Cause Concerning Removal - Judge Gilmore , filed by Computershare Trust Company, N.A.. (Johnston, Kenneth)
January 2, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U. S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate is available by clicking on the hyperlink and is also on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge, filed. (bthomas, 4)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order to Show Cause Concerning Removal.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Memorandum and Order Regarding Discovery Motions, Motions for Summary Judgment and Analogous Motions to Dismiss.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/1/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr recused. Case reassigned to Judge Vanessa D Gilmore for all further proceedings.(Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(kpicota, 4)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/26/2019 at 03:00 PM in Room 11521 before Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 80th District Court, Harris County, Tx, case number 2018-83216 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21542704) filed by Computershare Trust Company, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Original Petition & RFD, #2 Exhibit Other State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit Docket Sheet for State Court Action, #4 Affidavit of Dan Klein, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnston, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fernandez v. Equiniti Trust Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A Fernandez
Represented By: Christopher Augustine Gabel
Represented By: Peter Kelley Taaffe
Represented By: Anthony G Buzbee
Represented By: Crystal Del Toro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Sherwin-Williams Company
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Bluebond
Represented By: Christopher Brian Watt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equiniti Trust Company d/b/a EQ Shareowner Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Computershare Trust Company, N.A.
Represented By: Kenneth C Johnston
Represented By: Daniel S. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equiniti Trust Company
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Bluebond
Represented By: Christopher Brian Watt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?