Hoffman et al v. Stepp et al

Plaintiff: Kathleen Hoffman and Premium Star LLC
Defendant: Lazydays R.V. Center LLC, Sunset Custom Coach, Lisa Stepp, Henry Stepp, Jr and Lazydays' R.V. Center, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv04835
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Vanessa D Gilmore
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Lazydays' R.V. Center, LLC served on 2/13/2019, answer due 3/6/2019, filed.(dterrell, 2)
February 1, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN of Service Executed as to Lisa Stepp on 1/31/2019 re: Summons, filed.(jguajardo, 4)
February 1, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of Service Executed as to Henry Stepp Jr. on 1/31/2019 re: Summons, filed.(jguajardo, 4)
February 1, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of Service Executed as to Sunset Custom Coach on 1-31-2019 re: Summons, filed.(jguajardo, 4)
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Lazydays' R.V. Center, LLC, Lisa Stepp, Sunset Custom Coach. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons-Stepp, #2 Summons-Sunset)(rguerrero, 4)
January 10, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Sunset Custom Coach, filed.(Power, William)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Lisa Stepp, filed.(Power, William)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Lazydays' R.V. Center, LLC, filed.(Power, William)
January 7, 2019 Summons Issued as to Henry Stepp, Jr. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(hlerma, 4)
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(Power, William)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/17/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21546704) filed by Premium Star LLC.(Power, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoffman et al v. Stepp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lazydays R.V. Center LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunset Custom Coach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Stepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Stepp, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lazydays' R.V. Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Hoffman
Represented By: William R Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Premium Star LLC
Represented By: William R Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?