United States of America v. Hence Emergency Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Hence Emergency Services, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00030
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28:2345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Lynn N Hughes, pursuant to General Order 2019-1. All court settings are vacated Parties notified, filed. (SarahShelby, 4)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 **DISREGARD*** NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Lynn N Hughes, pursuant to General Order 2019-1. All court settings are vacated Parties notified, filed. (SarahShelby, 4) Modified on 1/8/2019 (SarahShelby, 4).
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/19/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hence Emergency Services, Inc. filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Indebtedness)(Cersonsky, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Hence Emergency Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hence Emergency Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: M H Cersonsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?