DSL Corporation v. Grieg Shipping II AS
Plaintiff: DSL Corporation
Defendant: Grieg Shipping II AS
Case Number: 4:2019cv00094
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sim Lake
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:1300
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting #8 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
February 18, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss by DSL Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Oliver, Robert)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DISMISSAL on Notice of Settlement. This action is dismissed without prejudice. Case terminated on 2/13/2019. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT by DSL Corporation, filed.(Oliver, Robert)
January 31, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by DSL Corporation, filed.(Oliver, Robert)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Grieg Shipping II AS. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(sanderson, 4)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Grieg Shipping II AS, filed.(Oliver, Robert)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/26/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21627199) filed by DSL Corporation.(Oliver, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DSL Corporation v. Grieg Shipping II AS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DSL Corporation
Represented By: Robert C. Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grieg Shipping II AS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?