JMW Law Group, P.L.L.C. v. Marquez

Plaintiff: JMW Law Group, P.L.L.C.
Defendant: Brandon Alexis Marquez
Case Number: 4:2019cv00099
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Nancy F Atlas
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #5 MOTION to Remand : Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas. Itis furtherORDERED that the parties may engage in jurisdictional discovery to becompleted by April 12, 2019.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time; Motion-related deadline set re: #3 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Chapter 27 of the Texas Civil Practice and Remedies Code. Responses due by 3/8/2019..(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time Time to Respond to Marquez's Motion to Dismiss Under TCPA by JMW Law Group, P.L.L.C., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Parmet, Matthew)
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to #5 MOTION to Remand, filed by JMW Law Group, P.L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D -- SOS Certificate, #2 Exhibit E -- Vo Declaration, #3 Exhibit F -- Patterson PLLC Correspondence, #4 Exhibit G -- Williams Declaration)(Parmet, Matthew)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition to #5 MOTION to Remand, filed by Brandon Alexis Marquez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Proposed Order)(Hoffer, Stewart)
February 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand by JMW Law Group, P.L.L.C., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Affidavit for Attempted Service, #2 Exhibit B -- Order for Substitute Service, #3 Exhibit C -- Affidavit of Substitute Service, #4 Proposed Order)(Parmet, Matthew)
February 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew S. Parmet on behalf of JMW Law Group, P.L.L.C., filed. (Parmet, Matthew)
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Chapter 27 of the Texas Civil Practice and Remedies Code by Brandon Alexis Marquez, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Proposed Order)(Hoffer, Stewart)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/13/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas. (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 61st Judicial District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 2018-16276 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21628466) filed by Brandon Alexis Marquez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Return of Service, #2 Exhibit B - St. Ct. Pleadings, #3 Exhibit C - St. Ct. Order, #4 Exhibit D - St. Ct. Docket Sheet, #5 Exhibit E - Index of Exhibits, #6 Exhibit F - List of Counsel, #7 Exhibit G - JMW Cert of Form)(Hoffer, Stewart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JMW Law Group, P.L.L.C. v. Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Alexis Marquez
Represented By: Stewart Hoffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JMW Law Group, P.L.L.C.
Represented By: Matthew Scott Parmet
Represented By: Randell S Boochoon
Represented By: Joe Micah Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?