Rossmann v. Wojocicki et al
Plaintiff: Brud Rossmann
Defendant: Professor Les Vermillion, Anwar Graves, Susan Bell, Miriam Sewell, US Magistrate G Michael Harvey, Lennert Leader, CEO Mark Gembicki, John Doe 2, 1 John Doe 1, Toyin Fasakin, Judge Rosemary Collyer, Patricia Henricks, John Doe Sub N, Susan Wojocicki, Professor Sergey Ivanov, Cathy Rojko, Crystal Lustig, Judge Ellen Segal Huvelle and Sundar Pichai
Case Number: 4:2019cv00115
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 88:8888
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order of USCA re: #18 Notice of Appeal ; USCA No. 19-20191. The appeal is dismissed pursuant to appellant's motion, filed.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
July 5, 2019 Filing 28 Voluntary Motion to Dismiss #18 pending Notice of Appeal by Brud Rossmann, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/26/2019. (rnieto, 1)
May 20, 2019 Filing 26 DECLARATION with Exhibits of Brud Rossmann, filed.(sanderson, 4)
May 6, 2019 Filing 25 DKT13 TRANSCRIPT ORDER REQUEST by Brud R. Rossmann. No hearings This order form relates to the following: #18 Notice of Appeal, filed.(jdav, 4)
April 29, 2019 Filing 24 Transmittal Letter on Appeal re: #18 Notice of Appeal. The electronic record on CD is being sent to Brud Rossmann via regular mail. (USCA No. 19-20191), filed. (dnoriega, 1)
April 29, 2019 Electronic record on appeal certified to the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals re: #18 Notice of Appeal USCA No. 19-20191, filed.(dnoriega, 1)
April 12, 2019 Notice of Assignment of USCA No. 19-20191 re: #18 Notice of Appeal, filed.(dnoriega, 1)
April 10, 2019 Filing 23 Notice of Non-Compliance. Appellant has failed to: Submit the DKT13 transcript order form. Parties notified, filed. (jtabares, 1)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER OF DISMISSAL #14 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Case terminated on April 3, 2019 (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
April 2, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Change of Address and Request for Copies of Any Orders, Court Filings in This Matter by Brud Rossmann, filed. (lcorbett, 7)
March 28, 2019 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 3/28/2019. Case called. No one appeared. Appearances:None.(ERO:J. Olson), filed.(jmarchand, 4)
March 27, 2019 Appeal Review Notes re: #18 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: IFP. A motion to proceed in forma pauperis is pending.No hearings were held in the case - no transcripts., filed.(dbenavides, 1)
March 27, 2019 Filing 19 Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal. The following Notice of Appeal and related motions are pending in the District Court: #18 Notice of Appeal, #14 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Fee status: IFP, filed. (dbenavides, 1)
March 26, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEAL to US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit by Brud Rossmann, filed.(lrivera, 2)
February 15, 2019 Filing 17 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Brud Rossmann re: #9 Order on Motion for Leave to File, filed. (SamanthaWarda, 4)
February 14, 2019 Filing 16 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Brud Rossmann re: #8 Order for Initial Conference - FORM,, filed. (bmendoza, 5)
February 12, 2019 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Darrell Frazier, filed.(mmarquez, 5)
February 11, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Brud Rossmann, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/4/2019. (SamanthaWarda, 4)
February 11, 2019 Filing 13 Additional EXHIBITS re: #11 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Brud Rossmann, filed.(SamanthaWarda, 4)
February 11, 2019 Filing 12 EXHIBITS re: #11 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Brud Rossmann, filed.(SamanthaWarda, 4)
February 11, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Brud Rossmann. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Brud Rossmann. (Attachments: #1 Continuation, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(SamanthaWarda, 4)
February 11, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION And Exhibits of Darrell Frazier, filed.(bmendoza, 5)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/28/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 SECOND MOTION AND NOTICE OF BRUD ROSSMANN re: #6 Notice (Other) by Brud Rossmann, filed. (mmarquez, 5)
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION AND NOTICE of Brud Rossmann by Brud Rossmann, filed. (nortiz, 5)
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Brud Rossmann re: #2 Notice to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening, filed. (scastillo, 1) (Main Document 5 replaced on 1/24/2019) (scastillo, 1).
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Brud Rossmann, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/6/2019. (agould, 3)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Not Issued as to All Defendants - Plaintiff failed to submit with complaint properly completed Summons & USM-285. Plaintiff notified of deficiencies by First-class mail. Blank copies of Summons and USM-285 provided to Pltf, filed.(sanderson, 4)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (sanderson, 4)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Brud Rossmann. (Application to Proceed IFP Conditionally Granted on 1/10/19 by Judge Sim Lake) (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Complaint, #2 Continuation of Complaint, #3 Continuation of Complaint, #4 Continuation of Complaint, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service, #7 Waiver of Service of Summons)(sanderson, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rossmann v. Wojocicki et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Professor Les Vermillion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anwar Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miriam Sewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Magistrate G Michael Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lennert Leader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEO Mark Gembicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1 John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyin Fasakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Rosemary Collyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Henricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Sub N
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Wojocicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Professor Sergey Ivanov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy Rojko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Lustig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Ellen Segal Huvelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sundar Pichai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brud Rossmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?