Gray v. Whitaker
Plaintiff: Tarrika Gray
Defendant: Matthew Whitaker
Case Number: 4:2019cv00147
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Re Issued as to Matthew Whitaker. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF. Re-Issued second time attorney called did not receive summons, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation)(mmapps, 4)
February 15, 2019 Summons Re-Issued as to Matthew Whitaker, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(pyebernetsky, 4)
January 30, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Tarrika Gray, filed.(Williams, Kathryn)
January 30, 2019 Summons Issued as to Matthew Whitaker, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(mmapps, 4)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Matthew Whitaker (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21651410) filed by Tarrika Gray. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Williams, Kathryn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tarrika Gray
Represented By: Kathryn Young Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?