Ramirez et al v. Home Depot USA, Inc.

Plaintiff: Steven Ramirez and SMASH DESIGN, LLC
Defendant: HOME DEPOT USA, INC.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00165
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Steven Ramirez, Smash Design, LLC, filed.(Todd, Alton)
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 Amended CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Steven Ramirez, Smash Design, LLC, filed.(Todd, Alton)
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Home Depot USA, Inc., filed.(Barger, Darrell)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Steven Ramirez, Smash Design, LLC, filed.(Todd, Alton)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Home Depot USA, Inc., filed.(Barger, Darrell)
January 17, 2019 Summons Issued as to Home Depot USA, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(hlerma, 4)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/27/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to HOME DEPOT USA, INC., filed.(Todd, Alton)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21665459) filed by Steven Ramirez, SMASH DESIGN, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Todd, Alton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez et al v. Home Depot USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Ramirez
Represented By: Alton C Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMASH DESIGN, LLC
Represented By: Alton C Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOME DEPOT USA, INC.
Represented By: Darrell Lee Barger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?