Danos, L.L.C. v. Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Danos, L.L.C.
Defendant: Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00176
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time Responses due by 4/2/2019..(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
March 12, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Counterclaim by Danos, L.L.C., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scott, Kellen)
February 26, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Danos, L.L.C. by Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, filed.(Sheaffer, Courtney)
February 7, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, filed.(Sheaffer, Courtney)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Designate John B Dunlap III as Attorney-in-Charge for Plaintiffs. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
February 7, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION Leave to Designate Attorney-in-Charge by Danos, L.L.C., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scott, Kellen)
February 6, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC served on 1/23/2019, answer due 2/13/2019, filed.(Scott, Kellen)
February 1, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Danos, L.L.C., filed.(Scott, Kellen)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Susan Eccles to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Danos, LLC.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Jennifer Ann Fiore to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Danos, LLC.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for John B. Dunlap, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Danos, LLC.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Susan Eccles to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Danos, L.L.C., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/12/2019. (thanniable, 4)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Jennifer Ann Fiore to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Danos, L.L.C., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/12/2019. (thanniable, 4)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for John B. Dunlap III to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Danos, L.L.C., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/12/2019. (thanniable, 4)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(sanderson, 4)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, filed.(Scott, Kellen)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/19/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Danos, L.L.C., filed.(Scott, Kellen)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21669988) filed by Danos, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Carbo, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Danos, L.L.C. v. Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Moore
Represented By: Courtney Bryan Sheaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danos, L.L.C.
Represented By: Kellen Ross Scott
Represented By: C Larry Carbo, III
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Fiore
Represented By: Susan Eccles
Represented By: John B Dunlap, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?