Praetorian Insurance Company v. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.

Plaintiff: Praetorian Insurance Company
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00181
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Hoyt
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOLLOWING TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 3/11/2019 at 8:45 A.M. Appearances: Jake Skaggs Paul William Bennett. Discovery may be extended by agreement of the parties without Court intervention. The dispositive motion deadline and docket call dates, however, may not be extended without leave of Court. Attorney fee applications are handled on the papers of the parties after notice. Expedited responses are required on all pretrial motions save dispositive motions. ETT: 4-5 Days. Jury trial. Pltf Expert Witness List due by 8/30/2019. Pltf Expert Report due by 8/30/2019. Deft Expert Witness List due by 9/30/2019. Deft Expert Report due by 9/30/2019. Discovery due by 11/30/2019. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 12/15/2019. Docket Call set for 2/3/2020 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 11A before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 Amended CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., filed.(Bennett, Paul)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Praetorian Insurance Company, filed.(Schulze, Jason)
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., filed.(Bell, Alex)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Telephone and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Counsel who filed or removed the action is responsible for placing the conference call and insuring that all parties are on the line. The call shall be placed to (713)250-5613. Telephone Conference set for 3/11/2019 at 08:45 AM before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., filed.(Bennett, Paul)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 334th Judicial District Court, case number 2018-89261 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21673499) filed by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Bennett, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Praetorian Insurance Company v. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Praetorian Insurance Company
Represented By: Jason Steven Schulze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Paul William Bennett
Represented By: Alex Johnathan Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?