Velez De Villa Mejia v. JP Morgan Chase & Co.

Plaintiff: Kevin Velez De Villa Mejia
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase & Co.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00201
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #11 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal, the Court dismisses Pltf's Complaint without prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs and attorney's fees.....*** Case terminated on 3/1/19.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
March 1, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal by JP Morgan Chase & Co., filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Holt, Aaron)
February 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Holt on behalf of JP Morgan Chase & Co., filed. (Holt, Aaron)
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Nandini Kavuri on behalf of JP Morgan Chase & Co., filed. (Kavuri, Nandini)
February 14, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to JP Morgan Chase & Co. served on 1/22/2019, answer due 3/25/2019, filed.(Klepper, Gabrielle)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR CERTAIN EMPLOYMENT CASES entered regarding Initial Discovery Protocols.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Continuation) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Abby Salzer to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Abby Salzer to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin Velez De Villa Mejia, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/12/2019. (Klepper, Gabrielle)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 4/12/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Attachments) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to JP Morgan Chase & Co.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(rguerrero, 4)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to JP Morgan Chase & Co., filed.(Klepper, Gabrielle)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JP Morgan Chase & Co. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21681572) filed by Kevin Velez De Villa Mejia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Interested Parties)(Klepper, Gabrielle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Velez De Villa Mejia v. JP Morgan Chase & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase & Co.
Represented By: Aaron Holt
Represented By: Nandini Kavuri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Velez De Villa Mejia
Represented By: Gabrielle Elizabeth Klepper
Represented By: Abby Salzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?