Garcia v. Autumn Business Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Erik Garcia
Defendant: Autumn Business Inc. and Yam Business Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00202
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Nancy F Atlas
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Autumn Business Inc. served on 2/21/2019, answer due 3/14/2019, filed.(Schapiro, Douglas)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Yam Business Inc. served on 2/21/2019, answer due 3/14/2019, filed.(Schapiro, Douglas)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/10/2019 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas. (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Autumn Business Inc., Yam Business Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 summons - Yam Business)(rguerrero, 4)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Erik Garcia, filed.(Schapiro, Douglas)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Schapiro, Douglas)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Autumn Business Inc., Yam Business Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21682190) filed by Erik Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schapiro, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Autumn Business Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autumn Business Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yam Business Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Garcia
Represented By: Douglas Steven Schapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?