Praxis Energy Agents LLC v. M/V CARIBE MARIA
Plaintiff: Praxis Energy Agents LLC
Defendant: M/V CARIBE MARIA
Case Number: 4:2019cv00302
Filed: January 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Hoyt
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF DISMISSAL ON NOTICE. Case terminated on February 4, 2019. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
February 1, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Dismissal as to M/V CARIBE MARIA by Praxis Energy Agents LLC, filed. (Sparkman, Briton)
January 30, 2019 Filing 14 Sealed ORDER. Ex Parte Motion to Move Vessel within Port, filed. (cfelchak, 4)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #5 Motion for Issuance of Warrant (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Issuance of Warrant (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4)
January 30, 2019 Arrest WARRANT issued (Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo), filed. (cfelchak, 4)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified. (cfelchak, 4)
January 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Briton P. Sparkman on behalf of Praxis Energy Agents LLC, filed. (Sparkman, Briton)
January 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret L. Manns on behalf of Praxis Energy Agents LLC, filed. (Manns, Margaret)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Telephone and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Counsel who filed or removed the action is responsible for placing the conference call and insuring that all parties are on the line. The call shall be placed to (713)250-5613. Telephone Conference set for 6/24/2019 at 08:30 AM by telephone before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
January 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret L. Manns on behalf of Praxis Energy Agents LLC, filed. (Chalos, George)
January 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Briton P. Sparkman on behalf of Praxis Energy Agents LLC, filed. (Chalos, George)
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant by Praxis Energy Agents LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/19/2019. (Chalos, George)
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant by Praxis Energy Agents LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order To Allow Vessel to Move Within Port)(Chalos, George)
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant by Praxis Energy Agents LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Authorizing Issuance of Warrant of Arrest)(Chalos, George)
January 29, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Praxis Energy Agents LLC, filed.(Chalos, George)
January 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against M/V CARIBE MARIA (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21745427) filed by Praxis Energy Agents LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Verification)(Chalos, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Praxis Energy Agents LLC v. M/V CARIBE MARIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Praxis Energy Agents LLC
Represented By: George M Chalos
Represented By: Margaret Lynette Manns
Represented By: Briton Paul Sparkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V CARIBE MARIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?