Utah Gas Operating Solutions, LLC v. Global Power Supply, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Utah Gas Operating Solutions, LLC
Defendant: Compression/Generation Services, LLC, Kimberly Sheppard, Abba Freight Systems, LLC, Midwest Machinery Transport, Inc., Global Power Supply, LLC and Michael Sheppard
Case Number: 4:2019cv00354
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Vanessa D Gilmore
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 47:11707
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Memorandum and Order Regarding Discovery Motions, Motions for Summary Judgment and Analogous Motions to Dismiss.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
March 27, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to #9 MOTION to Remand, filed by Utah Gas Operating Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Spence, W)
March 25, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #9 MOTION to Remand filed by Midwest Machinery Transport, Inc., Michael Sheppard. (Knight, Katherine)
March 13, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #9 MOTION to Remand filed by Utah Gas Operating Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Spence, W)
March 4, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand by Global Power Supply, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order)(Liberato, Lynne)
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 Amended CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Utah Gas Operating Solutions, LLC, filed.(Spence, W)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Utah Gas Operating Solutions, LLC, filed.(Spence, W)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Compression/Generation Services, LLC, filed.(Patterson, Pete)
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal,,,, #2 Exhibits,,,, by Midwest Machinery Transport, Inc., Michael Sheppard, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Knight, Katherine)
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Midwest Machinery Transport, Inc., filed.(Knight, Katherine)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/7/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 Additional EXHIBITS to #1 Notice of Removal by Midwest Machinery Transport, Inc., Michael Sheppard, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-46, #2 Exhibit A-47, #3 Exhibit A-48, #4 Exhibit A-49, #5 Exhibit A-50, #6 Exhibit A-51, #7 Exhibit A-52, #8 Exhibit A-53, #9 Exhibit A-54, #10 Exhibit A-55, #11 Exhibit A-56, #12 Exhibit A-57, #13 Exhibit A-58, #14 Exhibit A-59, #15 Exhibit A-60, #16 Exhibit A-61, #17 Exhibit A-62, #18 Exhibit A-63, #19 Exhibit A-64, #20 Exhibit A-65, #21 Exhibit A-66, #22 Exhibit A-67, #23 Exhibit A-68, #24 Exhibit A-69, #25 Exhibit A-70, #26 Exhibit A-71, #27 Exhibit A-72, #28 Exhibit A-73, #29 Exhibit A-74, #30 Exhibit A-75, #31 Exhibit A-76, #32 Exhibit A-77, #33 Exhibit A-78, #34 Exhibit A-79, #35 Exhibit A-80, #36 Exhibit A-81, #37 Exhibit A-82, #38 Exhibit A-83, #39 Exhibit A-84, #40 Exhibit A-85, #41 Exhibit A-86, #42 Exhibit A-87, #43 Exhibit B, #44 Exhibit C, #45 Exhibit D, #46 Civil Cover Sheet)(Henry, Vic) Modified on 2/1/2019 (gkelner, 4).
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 80th District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 2016-39282 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21779942) filed by Michael Sheppard, Midwest Machinery Transport, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit A-4, #6 Exhibit A-5, #7 Exhibit A-6, #8 Exhibit A-7, #9 Exhibit A-8, #10 Exhibit A-9, #11 Exhibit A-10, #12 Exhibit A-11, #13 Exhibit A-12, #14 Exhibit A-13, #15 Exhibit A-14, #16 Exhibit A-15, #17 Exhibit A-16, #18 Exhibit A-17, #19 Exhibit A-18, #20 Exhibit A-19, #21 Exhibit A-20, #22 Exhibit A-21, #23 Exhibit A-22, #24 Exhibit A-23, #25 Exhibit A-24, #26 Exhibit A-25, #27 Exhibit A-26, #28 Exhibit A-27, #29 Exhibit A-28, #30 Exhibit A-29, #31 Exhibit A-30, #32 Exhibit A-31, #33 Exhibit A-32, #34 Exhibit A-33, #35 Exhibit A-34, #36 Exhibit A-35, #37 Exhibit A-36, #38 Exhibit A-37, #39 Exhibit A-38, #40 Exhibit A-39, #41 Exhibit A-40, #42 Exhibit A-41, #43 Exhibit A-42, #44 Exhibit A-43, #45 Exhibit A-44, #46 Exhibit A-45)(Henry, Vic)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Utah Gas Operating Solutions, LLC v. Global Power Supply, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Utah Gas Operating Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Bryan Nathaniel Prentice
Represented By: W Ross Spence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compression/Generation Services, LLC
Represented By: Pete Thomas Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abba Freight Systems, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Lee Fulkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Machinery Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine Johnson Knight
Represented By: Vic Houston Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Power Supply, LLC
Represented By: J Shelby Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sheppard
Represented By: Katherine Johnson Knight
Represented By: Vic Houston Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?