Western World Insurance Company v. Imbera S.A. de C.V. et al
Plaintiff: Western World Insurance Company
Defendant: Irvin International Inc., Coca-Cola Company, Imbera USA LLC, Innovative Displayworks, Inc. and Imbera S.A. de C.V.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00449
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Vanessa D Gilmore
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(ckrus, 4)
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Western World Insurance Company, filed.(Amuny, Christy)
February 15, 2019 Summons Issued as to Innovative Displayworks, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
February 14, 2019 Filing 8 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Western World Insurance Company.(Amuny, Christy)
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 First CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Western World Insurance Company, filed.(Amuny, Christy)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Innovative Displayworks, Inc., filed.(Amuny, Christy)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation, #2 Continuation, #3 Continuation)(Amuny, Christy)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/21/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Coca-Cola Company, Imbera S.A. de C.V., Imbera USA LLC, Irvin International Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons.ImberaUSA, #2 Summons.Irvin, #3 Summons.Coca-Cola)(rguerrero, 4)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation, #2 Continuation, #3 Continuation)(Amuny, Christy)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21830554) filed by Western World Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Amuny, Christy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western World Insurance Company v. Imbera S.A. de C.V. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irvin International Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coca-Cola Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imbera USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innovative Displayworks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imbera S.A. de C.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western World Insurance Company
Represented By: Christy Amuny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?