Jagged Peak Energy LLC v. Allamon Tool Company Inc
Plaintiff: Jagged Peak Energy LLC
Defendant: Allamon Tool Company Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00452
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Allamon Tool Company Inc, filed.(Book, William)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Shannon M. Bell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for William J. Kelly, III, to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Shannon M. Bell to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jagged Peak Energy LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/22/2019. (Evans, Christopher)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for William J. Kelly III to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jagged Peak Energy LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/22/2019. (Evans, Christopher)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Allamon Tool Company Inc served on 2/13/2019, answer due 4/15/2019, filed.(Evans, Christopher)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jagged Peak Energy LLC, filed.(Evans, Christopher)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER FOR CONFERENCE. Initial Conference set for 5/13/2019 at 10:00 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allamon Tool Company Inc (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21833377) filed by Jagged Peak Energy LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Evans, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jagged Peak Energy LLC v. Allamon Tool Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allamon Tool Company Inc
Represented By: William Carroll Book, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jagged Peak Energy LLC
Represented By: Christopher L Evans
Represented By: William J. Kelly, III
Represented By: Shannon M. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?