Le v. Lasko Products, Inc.

Plaintiff: Bao Le
Defendant: Lasko Products, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00499
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 Final DISMISSAL. Having been advised that Bao Le is no longer pursuing his claims against Lasko Products, this case is dismissed without prejudice #5 . If refiled in this district, the case will be assigned to Judge Lynn N. Hughes. Case terminated on 2/26/2019. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION of Dismissal WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Bao Le, filed.(Buzbee, Anthony)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Resetting Conference. On the agreement of the parties, Initial Conference reset for 3/15/2019 at 10:30 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order: Initial Conference set for 3/8/2019 at 03:00 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes.(Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (sanderson, 4)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case(Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 269th Judicial District Court, case number 2019-04398 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21873292) filed by Lasko Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of attachments, #2 Exhibit State Court docket, #3 Exhibit State Court documents)(Self, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Le v. Lasko Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lasko Products, Inc.
Represented By: Scott W Self
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bao Le
Represented By: Cornelia Brandfield-Harvey
Represented By: Anthony G Buzbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?