Nguyen v. Wells Fargo Bank National Association
Plaintiff: Patterson Nguyen
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank National Association
3Rd Party Defendant: Richard P. Williams, Jr. and Juanita E. Wheeler-Williams
Case Number: 4:2019cv00558
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER. ETT: 2 days. Jury Trial. Amended Pleadings due by 9/14/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 9/14/2019 Pltf Expert Report due by 11/8/2019. Deft Expert Report due by 12/13/2019. Discovery due by 2/7/2020. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 3/2/2020. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 3/2/2020. Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/25/2020. Jury Trial set for 6/1/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3A before Judge Keith P Ellison(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4)
April 10, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Patterson Nguyen, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/1/2019. (Salisbury, Douglas)
April 2, 2019 Filing 9 Notice Regarding Initial Conference(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
March 21, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Juanita E. Wheeler-Williams, Richard P. Williams, Jr.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summon)(hlerma, 4)
March 20, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Juanita E. Wheeler-Williams, filed.(Shirazi, Sahar)
March 20, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Richard P. Williams, Jr., filed.(Shirazi, Sahar)
March 20, 2019 Filing 5 COUNTERCLAIM against Patterson Nguyen filed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Shirazi, Sahar)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by B. David L. Foster on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank National Association, filed. (Foster, Benjamin)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Sahar H. Shirazi on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank National Association, filed. (Shirazi, Sahar)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/26/2019 at 02:45 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 80th Judicial District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 2019-03817 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21894420) filed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit D-1, #6 Exhibit D-2, #7 Exhibit D-3, #8 Exhibit D-4, #9 Exhibit E)(Mowrey, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nguyen v. Wells Fargo Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patterson Nguyen
Represented By: Benjamin Francis Foster
Represented By: Douglas Robert Salisbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank National Association
Represented By: Robert T Mowrey
Represented By: Benjamin David Lee Foster
Represented By: Sahar Haidari Shirazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Richard P. Williams, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Juanita E. Wheeler-Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?