Primary Residential Mortgage Inc. et al. v. Elizabeth Thomas et al. DO NOT DOCKET. CASE HAS BEEN REMANDED.

Plaintiff: Primary Residential Mortgage Inc., Meritage Homes Of Texas LLC. and Maria Perez
Defendant: Robert L Thomas
Appellee: MICHAEL PIZZITOLA, MICHAEL MATERNA, RODNEY B HOWERTON, DAVID JORDAN, KEVIN MEUTH, DAVID MODLIN, MELISSA HANNA, MERITAGE HOMES OF TEXAS LLC, JEFF BARFIELD, CHRIS HUEBNER, STEWART TITLE COMPANY, MARY A LESTER, MTH LENDING GROUP LP, MERITAGE HOMES CORPORATION, MTH Lending Group, LP, Meritage Homes of Texas, LLC and Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: James Allen and McCarthy&HolthusLLP
Appellant: ELIZABETH THOMAS
Case Number: 4:2019cv00559
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Filing 39 LETTERTOCLERKOFCOURT FOR CERTIFIED MAILING OF ORDER by James Allen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(McClure, Colleen)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER of Sanctions and Preclusion(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Remand; granting #15 Motion to Remand. Plaintiff's shall recover attorneys' fees in the amount of $3,318.00 from Defendant jointly and severally, for which let execution issue. This case is remanded to the 127th Judicial District Court of Harris County, Texas.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
April 10, 2019 Filing 35 Summons Issued as to McCarthy&HolthusLLP. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
April 9, 2019 Filing 34 REPLY to Response to #29 Opposed MOTION for Clarification, filed by Robert L Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit C-1, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(McClure, Colleen)
April 9, 2019 Filing 33 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Robert L Thomas, filed.(McClure, Colleen)
April 9, 2019 Filing 32 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs filed by James Allen.(McClure, Colleen)
April 4, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition to #29 Opposed MOTION for Clarification, filed by Meritage Homes Of Texas LLC., Primary Residential Mortgage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Removal filed in State Court Case No. 2017-76078)(McKinney, Andrew)
April 3, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Roger G. Jain and Thomas H. Smith III on behalf of Maria Perez, filed. (Smith, Thomas)
April 2, 2019 Filing 29 Opposed MOTION for Clarification by James Allen, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Judge's Procedures)(McClure, Colleen)
March 15, 2019 Filing 28 JOINDER in #20 Joinder, #17 Response in Opposition to Motion, #22 Surreply to Motion, #19 Reply in Support of Motion, #23 Surreply to Motion, #27 Reply to Response to Motion DeclarationofAttorneyJamesAndersen, filed by Elizabeth Thomas. (McClure, Colleen)
March 14, 2019 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to #15 MOTION to Remand, #11 MOTION to Remand, filed by James Allen. (McClure, Colleen)
March 13, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE to Defendants' Sur-Reply and Motion to Dismiss, and Request for Oral Hearing, filed by Meritage Homes Corporation, Meritage Homes Of Texas LLC.. (Altsuler, Kimberly)
March 12, 2019 Initial Filing fee: $400.00 re: #1 Notice of Removal, receipt number HOU087046, filed. (thanniable, 4)
March 12, 2019 Filing 25 STATEMENT OF DESIGNATED NAMED PARTIES by James Allen, filed.(McClure, Colleen)
March 11, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Mary A Lester, MTH Lending Group, LP, Meritage Homes Of Texas LLC., Primary Residential Mortgage Inc., Stewart Title Company, filed.(Chang, Jennifer)
March 6, 2019 Filing 23 SURREPLY to #15 MOTION to Remand, #11 MOTION to Remand, filed by James Allen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(McClure, Colleen)
March 6, 2019 Filing 22 SURREPLY to #15 MOTION to Remand, #11 MOTION to Remand, filed by James Allen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(McClure, Colleen)
March 4, 2019 Filing 21 CLERKS NOTICE of Filing Fee Due. Parties notified, filed. (klove, 4)
March 1, 2019 Filing 20 JOINDER in #15 MOTION to Remand, #11 MOTION to Remand , filed by MTH Lending Group, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Holidy, Dale)
March 1, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY in Support of #11 MOTION to Remand, filed by Meritage Homes Of Texas LLC., Primary Residential Mortgage Inc.. (Altsuler, Kimberly)
March 1, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Jennifer Chang re: #11 MOTION to Remand, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(McKinney, Andrew)
March 1, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition to #15 MOTION to Remand, filed by James Allen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(McClure, Colleen)
February 27, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to #6 Opposed EMERGENCY MOTION MOTION to Alter Judgment, filed by Robert L Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McClure, Colleen)
February 27, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand by Stewart Title Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (state court notice), #2 Proposed Order)(McElhaney, Scott)
February 27, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #7 Opposed EMERGENCY MOTION MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #6 Opposed EMERGENCY MOTION MOTION to Alter Judgment, #11 MOTION to Remand filed by Meritage Homes Of Texas LLC., Primary Residential Mortgage Inc.. (Altsuler, Kimberly)
February 26, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition to #11 MOTION to Remand, filed by James Allen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Proposed Order, #15 Proposed Order, #16 Proposed Order)(McClure, Colleen)
February 25, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Altsuler, Kimberly)
February 22, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand by Meritage Homes Of Texas LLC., Primary Residential Mortgage Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #7 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #8 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Altsuler, Kimberly)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/24/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
February 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE Amended Notice of Removal re: #1 Notice of Removal by James Allen, filed. (McClure, Colleen)
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Transfer. Case reassigned to Judge David Hittner for the following reason: Related to case H-18-cv--0851 and agreement between the judges. Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (leddins, 4)
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 Opposed EMERGENCY MOTION( Motion Docket Date 3/13/2019.), MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Robert L Thomas, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit I-A, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Proposed Order)(McClure, Colleen)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 Opposed EMERGENCY MOTION( Motion Docket Date 3/13/2019.), MOTION to Alter Judgment by James Allen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Proposed Order)(McClure, Colleen)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OFUNCONSOLIDATED CASE re: #1 Notice of Removal by MICHAEL PIZZITOLA, KEVIN MEUTH, DAVID JORDAN, RODNEY B HOWERTON, DAVID MODLIN, JEFF BARFIELD, MICHAEL MATERNA, CHRIS HUEBNER, MELISSA HANNA, ELIZABETH THOMAS, filed. (McClure, Colleen)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OFUNCONSOLIDATED CASE re: #1 Notice of Removal by ELIZABETH THOMAS, MERITAGE HOMES CORPORATION, MERITAGE HOMES OF TEXAS LLC, MTH LENDING GROUP LP, PRIMARY RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE INC., STEWART TITLE COMPANY, MARY A LESTER, filed. (McClure, Colleen)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Robert L Thomas, filed.(McClure, Colleen)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OFRELATEDCASEMOTIONTOTRANSFER by Robert L Thomas, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McClure, Colleen)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 127th Judicial District court, case number 2018-91506 () filed by Elizabeth Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(McClure, Colleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Primary Residential Mortgage Inc. et al. v. Elizabeth Thomas et al. DO NOT DOCKET. CASE HAS BEEN REMANDED.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MICHAEL PIZZITOLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MICHAEL MATERNA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: RODNEY B HOWERTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DAVID JORDAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: KEVIN MEUTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DAVID MODLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MELISSA HANNA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MERITAGE HOMES OF TEXAS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JEFF BARFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CHRIS HUEBNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: STEWART TITLE COMPANY
Represented By: Scott Masur McElhaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MARY A LESTER
Represented By: Scott Masur McElhaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MTH LENDING GROUP LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MERITAGE HOMES CORPORATION
Represented By: Kimberly G Altsuler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MTH Lending Group, LP
Represented By: Dale Marett Holidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Meritage Homes of Texas, LLC
Represented By: Kimberly G Altsuler
Represented By: Barry Stephen Rabon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Nicole Chang
Represented By: Andrew T McKinney, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Primary Residential Mortgage Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Nicole Chang
Represented By: Andrew T McKinney, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meritage Homes Of Texas LLC.
Represented By: Kimberly G Altsuler
Represented By: Barry Stephen Rabon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Perez
Represented By: Thomas H Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L Thomas
Represented By: Colleen Michele McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: James Allen
Represented By: Colleen Michele McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: McCarthy&HolthusLLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: ELIZABETH THOMAS
Represented By: Colleen Michele McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?