Sustainable Shark Alliance , et al. v. Smith, et al.
Plaintiff: SUSTAINABLE SHARK ALLIANCE, VENICE SEAFOOD, LLC and OCHOA SEAFOOD ENTERPRISES
Defendant: THE HONRABLE KEN PAXTON, in his official capacity as the Attorney General of the State of Texas, THE HONORABLE CARTER SMITH, in his official capacity as the Executive Director of the Texas Parks & Wildlife Department, Ken Paxton and Carter Smith
Case Number: 4:2019cv00561
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 88:8888
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY in Support of #17 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, , filed by Ken Paxton, Carter Smith. (Abrams, Michael)
April 17, 2019 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION Motion to Excede Page Limits by Ken Paxton, Carter Smith, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Abrams, Michael)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Fabio Dworschak terminated.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
April 12, 2019 Filing 19 Opposed RESPONSE to #17 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, filed by Ochoa Seafood Enterprises, Sustainable Shark Alliance, Venice Seafood, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Shark Landings)(Gehan, Shaun)
April 2, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Amber Ahmed on behalf of Ken Paxton, Carter Smith, filed. (Ahmed, Jessica)
March 22, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Ken Paxton, Carter Smith, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/12/2019. (Abrams, Michael)
March 18, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Shelly M. Doggett on behalf of Ken Paxton, Carter Smith, filed. (Doggett, Shelly)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Withdrawing #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ( Deft. Responses due by 3/22/2019.)(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
March 7, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Fabio Dworschak to Withdraw as Attorney by Ochoa Seafood Enterprises, Sustainable Shark Alliance, Venice Seafood, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dworschak, Fabio)
March 4, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Ken Paxton, Carter Smith, filed.(Abrams, Michael)
February 28, 2019 Filing 12 ADVISORY by Ken Paxton, Carter Smith, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Abrams, Michael)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 MOTION for Shaun M. Gehan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(olindor, 4)
February 26, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alfred H Bennett. MOTION HEARING held on 2/26/2019 ; Motion-related deadline set re: #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice conditionally granted pending verification of status. Motion for TRO DENIED. A hearing on the Preliminary Injunction will be set after formal response is filed by defendants. Appearances:Shaun Gehan. Fabio Dworschak, Michael Raphael Abrams.(Court Reporter: N. Forrest), filed.(ledwards, 4)
February 25, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Ken Paxton, Carter Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Abrams, Michael)
February 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Setting as to #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 2/26/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett, filed. (ledwards, 4)
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ochoa Seafood Enterprises, Sustainable Shark Alliance, Venice Seafood, LLC, filed.(Dworschak, Fabio)
February 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Shaun M. Gehan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ochoa Seafood Enterprises, Sustainable Shark Alliance, Venice Seafood, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/15/2019. (Dworschak, Fabio)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Abrams on behalf of Ken Paxton, Carter Smith, filed. (Abrams, Michael)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order( Motion Docket Date 3/14/2019.), MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Ochoa Seafood Enterprises, Sustainable Shark Alliance, Venice Seafood, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: NMFS Office of Science and Tech., Print-out of landings inquiry, #2 Exhibit B: Declaration of Henry Huynh, #3 Exhibit C: Declaration of Russell Hudson, #4 Exhibit D: NMFS Trade Query, Products by Custom Districts, #5 Exhibit E: Declaration of Gabriel Ochoa, #6 Exhibit F: NMFS, Atlantic Highly Migratory Species Division, Atlantic Shark Commercial Fishery Landings and Retention Limit Update, #7 Proposed Order)(Dworschak, Fabio)
February 20, 2019 Summons Issued as to Ken Paxton, Carter Smith. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(SarahShelby, 4)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/31/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Smith - Summons 2nd Copy, #2 Summons, #3 Paxton - Summons 2nd Copy, #4 Supplement AG A-1 Form)(Dworschak, Fabio)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 ***DOCKETED IN ERROR**** Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Supplement AG a-1 form)(Dworschak, Fabio)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THE HONORABLE CARTER SMITH, in his official capacity as the Executive Director of the Texas Parks & Wildlife Department, THE HONRABLE KEN PAXTON, in his official capacity as the Attorney General of the State of Texas (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21897060) filed by SUSTAINABLE SHARK ALLIANCE, VENICE SEAFOOD, LLC, OCHOA SEAFOOD ENTERPRISES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Dworschak, Fabio)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sustainable Shark Alliance , et al. v. Smith, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE HONRABLE KEN PAXTON, in his official capacity as the Attorney General of the State of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE HONORABLE CARTER SMITH, in his official capacity as the Executive Director of the Texas Parks & Wildlife Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Paxton
Represented By: Michael Raphael Abrams
Represented By: Shelly Magan Doggett
Represented By: Jessica Amber Ahmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carter Smith
Represented By: Michael Raphael Abrams
Represented By: Shelly Magan Doggett
Represented By: Jessica Amber Ahmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSTAINABLE SHARK ALLIANCE
Represented By: Fabio Dworschak
Represented By: Shaun Michael Gehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VENICE SEAFOOD, LLC
Represented By: Fabio Dworschak
Represented By: Shaun Michael Gehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OCHOA SEAFOOD ENTERPRISES
Represented By: Fabio Dworschak
Represented By: Shaun Michael Gehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?