Inguran, LLC v. Butz et al

Plaintiff: INGURAN, LLC d/b/a SEXING TECHNOLOGIES and Inguran, LLC
Defendant: TIM RAUEN and MARK BUTZ
Case Number: 4:2019cv00574
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Filing 14 CLERKS NOTICE Hearing cancelled per: #13 Order. Parties notified., filed. (ledwards, 4)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Copy of Order entered in case #1:18cv00113 CJW-KEM by Judge C.J. Williams, Northern District of Iowa, filed.(ledwards, 4)
February 25, 2019 Filing 12 Additional EXHIBITS re: #10 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Iowa by Mark Butz, Tim Rauen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Michael L Rice, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Michael L Rice, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Michael L Rice, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Michael L Rice, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Michael L Rice, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Michael L Rice, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Michael L Rice)(Rice, Michael)
February 22, 2019 Filing 11 Opposed MOTION to Expedite Hearing by Mark Butz, Tim Rauen, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Rice, Michael)
February 22, 2019 Filing 10 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Iowa by Mark Butz, Tim Rauen, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Rice, Michael)
February 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L Rice on behalf of Mark Butz, Tim Rauen, filed. (Rice, Michael)
February 21, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(jguajardo, 4)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/31/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Setting as to #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, #6 EMERGENCY MOTION. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett, filed. (ledwards, 4)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 EMERGENCY MOTION by INGURAN, LLC d/b/a SEXING TECHNOLOGIES, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/13/2019. (Wetwiska, James)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by INGURAN, LLC d/b/a SEXING TECHNOLOGIES, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/13/2019. (Wetwiska, James)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to TIM RAUEN, filed.(Wetwiska, James)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to MARK BUTZ, filed.(Wetwiska, James)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of Juan Moreno by INGURAN, LLC d/b/a SEXING TECHNOLOGIES, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Wetwiska, James)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21904136) filed by INGURAN, LLC d/b/a SEXING TECHNOLOGIES.(Wetwiska, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Inguran, LLC v. Butz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIM RAUEN
Represented By: Michael L Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK BUTZ
Represented By: Michael L Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INGURAN, LLC d/b/a SEXING TECHNOLOGIES
Represented By: James R Wetwiska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inguran, LLC
Represented By: Michael Francis Reeder, II
Represented By: James R Wetwiska
Represented By: Kirt S. O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?