Hagger v. United States Department of Veteran's Affairs
Plaintiff: Clifton Willaims Hagger, Jr.
Defendant: United States Department of Veteran's Affairs
Case Number: 4:2019cv00577
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN Executed as to Ryan Patrick, United States Attorney, re: Order for Service, served on 2/28/2019, answer due 4/29/2019, filed.(SandraSilva, 7)
February 21, 2019 Summons Issued as to Secretary of the United States Department of Veteran's Affairs, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons and USM-285 form delivered to U.S. Marshal's office for service., filed.(JenniferOlson, 4)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (JenniferOlsonadi, 4)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 5/17/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Attachments) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Unites States Department of Veteran's Affairs filed by Clifton Willaims Hagger, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(JenniferOlson, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hagger v. United States Department of Veteran's Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifton Willaims Hagger, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Veteran's Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?