Gordon v. Sig Sauer, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dante Gordon
Defendant: Sig Sauer, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00585
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 5/29/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal, filed. (leddins, 4)
April 16, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Sig Sauer, Inc., filed.(Killian, Ryan)
April 16, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss by Sig Sauer, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order)(Killian, Ryan)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Robert Joyce to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Amy Crouch to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(kpicota, 4)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Brent Dwerlkotte to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(kpicota, 4)
March 15, 2019 Filing 13 LETTER OF AGREEMENT re: extension of Defendant's Answer Date by Sig Sauer, Inc., filed.(Killian, Ryan)
March 15, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Robert Joyce to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sig Sauer, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/5/2019. (Killian, Ryan)
March 15, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Brent Dwerlkotte to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sig Sauer, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/5/2019. (Killian, Ryan)
March 15, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Amy Crouch to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sig Sauer, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/5/2019. (Killian, Ryan)
March 4, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Sig Sauer, Inc. served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019, filed.(Allen, Brandon)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 MOTION for Neal J. Deckant to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(olindor, 4)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 MOTION for Joseph I. Marchese to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(olindor, 4)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 5/17/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Attachments) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
February 21, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(jguajardo, 4)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Neal J. Deckant to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dante Gordon, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/13/2019. (Oldham, Michael)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Joseph I. Marchese to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dante Gordon, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/13/2019. (Oldham, Michael)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Sig Sauer, Inc., filed.(Oldham, Michael)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sig Sauer, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21909721) filed by Dante Gordon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Oldham, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gordon v. Sig Sauer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dante Gordon
Represented By: Michael Kenan Oldham
Represented By: Brandon T Allen
Represented By: Neal J. Deckant
Represented By: Joseph I. Marchese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sig Sauer, Inc.
Represented By: David Brent Dwerlkotte
Represented By: Amy Crouch
Represented By: Ryan S Killian
Represented By: Robert Laurent Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?