Mendiola v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Mary Cynthia Mendiola
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Case Number: 4:2019cv00601
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Office of regional Chief Counsel, Region IV, Social Security Administration, served upon Kathy Drew, Staff Assistant, served on 3/14/2019, answer due 4/4/2019, filed.(sgonzalez, 5)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Ryan Patrick, United States Attorney, served on 2/28/2019, answer due 4/29/2019, filed.(SandraSilva, 7)
February 21, 2019 Summons Issued as to Nancy Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons and USM-285 form delivered to U.S. Marshal's office for service., filed.(JenniferOlson, 4)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy Berryhill filed by Mary Cynthia Mendiola. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(JenniferOlson, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendiola v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Cynthia Mendiola
Represented By: David Dopkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?