Goudeau et al v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Juliet Goudeau and Maurice Goudeau
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc., Covidien, LP and Davol Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00612
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 RECEIPT of Transfer received via email notification: transfer of case to Southern District of Ohio. New Case # assigned: 2:19-cv-00934 and received on 03/13/2019., filed. (BrendaLacy, 4)
March 11, 2019 Interdistrict transfer to Southern District of Ohio. Case transferred electronically. (lgouadi, 4)
March 11, 2019 Filing 12 JPML CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-23) transferring case to Southern District of Ohio to be included in MDL Docket No. 2846. (lgouadi, 4)
March 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Talbot on behalf of Juliet Goudeau, Maurice Goudeau, filed. (Bair, Ronald)
March 8, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Juliet Goudeau, Maurice Goudeau, filed.(Bair, Ronald)
March 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Talbot on behalf of Juliet Goudeau, Maurice Goudeau, filed. (Bair, Ronald)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Covidien LP shall have an extension of time through and including March 14, 2019, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' original complaint.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Covidien, LP identifying Medtronic plc as Corporate Parent, filed.(Nickel, Matthew)
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Original Complaint by Covidien, LP, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nickel, Matthew)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/25/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by C.R. Bard, Inc., Davol Inc., filed.(Hardin, Julie)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C.R. Bard, Inc. identifying Becton, Dickinson and Company as Corporate Parent, filed.(Hardin, Julie)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Davol Inc. identifying C.R. Bard, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Hardin, Julie)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 234th District Court, case number 2019-04003 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21919880) filed by Davol Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hardin, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goudeau et al v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juliet Goudeau
Represented By: Ronald Lee Bair
Represented By: David Arlington Talbot, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Goudeau
Represented By: Ronald Lee Bair
Represented By: David Arlington Talbot, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc.
Represented By: Julie A Hardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covidien, LP
Represented By: Matthew T Nickel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davol Inc.
Represented By: Julie A Hardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?