Iammarino et al v. Chicago Title of Texas, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kirby Iammarino and Ryan Iammarino
Defendant: Audra Diggs, Chicago Title of Texas, LLC, Ivy Partners, LLC and Quicken Loans Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00638
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Nancy F Atlas
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition to #11 MOTION to Remand, filed by Chicago Title of Texas, LLC. (Jones, Julia)
March 22, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand by Kirby Iammarino, Ryan Iammarino, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Proposed Order)(Sammons, Mary)
March 15, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Quicken Loans Inc., filed.(Sparks, Jacob)
March 15, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal by Quicken Loans Inc., filed.(Sparks, Jacob)
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Audra Diggs, Ivy Partners, LLC, filed.(Patel, Keval)
March 12, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Chicago Title of Texas, LLC, filed.(Jones, Julia)
March 12, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Kirby Iammarino, Ryan Iammarino, filed.(Sammons, Mary)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for Quicken Loans Inc. 3/15/2019.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Quicken Loans Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sparks, Jacob)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/1/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas. (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Chicago Title of Texas, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jones, Julia)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 61st District Court - Harris, case number 201904397 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21926678) filed by Chicago Title of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover sheet)(Jones, Julia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iammarino et al v. Chicago Title of Texas, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audra Diggs
Represented By: Keval Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Title of Texas, LLC
Represented By: Julia Kathryn Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivy Partners, LLC
Represented By: Keval Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quicken Loans Inc.
Represented By: Jacob Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirby Iammarino
Represented By: Mary Kathryn Sammons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Iammarino
Represented By: Mary Kathryn Sammons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?