Allied World National Assurance Company v. The Howard Hughes Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Allied World National Assurance Company
Defendant: The Howard Hughes Corporation and The Woodlands Land Development Company, L.P.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00667
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Case terminated on 3/18/2019 (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
March 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Dismissal as to The Howard Hughes Corporation, The Woodlands Land Development Company, L.P. by Allied World National Assurance Company, filed. (Clark, David)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/12/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allied World National Assurance Company identifying Allied World Assurance Holdings (U.S.) Inc. and Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, AG as Corporate Parent, filed.(McDanald, Kristen)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(Clark, David)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21943691) filed by Allied World National Assurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Clark, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allied World National Assurance Company v. The Howard Hughes Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Howard Hughes Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Woodlands Land Development Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allied World National Assurance Company
Represented By: David A Clark
Represented By: Kristen Welsh McDanald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?