Arevalo v. Geico Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Abel Arevalo
Defendant: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY
Undetermined: Megan C Moore
Case Number: 4:2019cv00678
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sim Lake
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Filing 11 FINAL JUDGMENT. This action is dismissed with prejudice. Case terminated on 4/25/2019. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Minor Settlement Conference held. The parties' proposed settlement is approved. Appearances: Cindy Culp for Defendant. Kathryn Lynn Knotts, Megan Charlotte Moore. Ct Reporter: G. Dye. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
March 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Minor Settlement Conference set for 4/25/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake, filed. (aboyd, 4)
March 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION. The Initial Conference set for 4/12/2019 at 2:00 PM is cancelled, filed. (aboyd, 4)
March 13, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Abel Arevalo, filed.(Knotts, Kathryn)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Joint MOTION for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
March 11, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem by GEICO Indemnity Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Herren, John)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER striking #2 Joint MOTION for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/12/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 Joint MOTION for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem by GEICO Indemnity Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Appointing Guardian ad Litem)(O'Herren, John)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 361st District, Brazos County, case number 19-000238-CV-361 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21946984) filed by GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY.(O'Herren, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arevalo v. Geico Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY
Represented By: John Hale O'Herren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abel Arevalo
Represented By: Craig William Carlson
Represented By: Kathryn Lynn Knotts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Megan C Moore
Represented By: Megan Charlotte Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?