Cobalt International Energy, Inc. et al v. Illinois National Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Cobalt International Energy, Inc.
Defendant: Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, North American Specialty Insurance Company, Alterra America Insurance Company, Federal Insurance Company, Endurance American Insurance Company, Aspen American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Illinois National Insurance Company, Westchester Fire Insurance Company, Freedom Specialty Insurance Company, Navigators Insurance Company, Beazley Insurance Company and RSUI Indemnity Company
Intervenor Plaintiff: Kenneth W. Moore, Jr., GAMCO Global Gold, Natural Resources & Income Trust, N. John Lancaster, Jr., William P. Utt, James W. Farnsworth, Peter R. Coneway, Henry Cornell, Martin H. Young, Myles W. Scoggins, Jack E. Golden, Joseph H. Bryant, GAMCO Natural Resources, Gold & Income Trust, D. Jeff Van Steenbergen, Kenneth A. Pontarelli, Jon A. Marshall, John P. Wilkirson and J. Hardy Murchison
Intervenor Defendant: Allied World Assurance Company
Interested Party: Continental Casualty Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00734
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Hoyt
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Filing 91 REPLY in Support of #77 MOTION to Remand, filed by Cobalt International Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit G, #3 Exhibit H, #4 Exhibit I)(Scott, Robert)
April 24, 2019 Filing 90 JOINDER in #85 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand, filed by Beazley Insurance Company. (Lane, Daniel)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting #81 Defendants Motion to Stay the Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Deadlines. All other deadlines set out in the Courts March 8 Order for Conference and Disclosure of Interested Parties are STAYED until the Court has ruled on the Plaintiffs Motion to Remand #77 ..(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
April 23, 2019 Filing 88 RESPONSE to #85 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand, filed by Arch Insurance Company. (Schaar, Jill)
April 22, 2019 Filing 87 JOINDER in #85 Response in Opposition to Motion , filed by Alterra America Insurance Company. (Economou, Cary)
April 22, 2019 Filing 86 DECLARATION of Michael S. Olsan in Support of re: #85 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19)(Restrepo, Ronald)
April 22, 2019 Filing 85 RESPONSE in Opposition to #77 MOTION to Remand, filed by Allied World Assurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Exhibit A)(Restrepo, Ronald)
April 18, 2019 Filing 84 SUPPLEMENT to #77 MOTION to Remand by Cobalt International Energy, Inc., filed.(Scott, Robert)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #50 Motion for Kevin G. Mikulaninec to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
April 17, 2019 Filing 82 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Non-Opposition re: #81 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Initial Scheduling Conference and Deadlines by Cobalt International Energy, Inc., filed. (Scott, Robert)
April 16, 2019 Filing 81 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Initial Scheduling Conference and Deadlines by Endurance American Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mungia, Manuel)
April 4, 2019 Filing 80 JOINDER in #77 MOTION to Remand , filed by Joseph H. Bryant, Peter R. Coneway, Henry Cornell, James W. Farnsworth, Jack E. Golden, N. John Lancaster, Jr., Jon A. Marshall, Kenneth W. Moore, Jr., J. Hardy Murchison, Kenneth A. Pontarelli, Myles W. Scoggins, William P. Utt, D. Jeff Van Steenbergen, John P. Wilkirson, Martin H. Young. (Reasoner, Barrett)
April 2, 2019 Filing 79 NOTICE of Submission of Corrected Order re: #77 MOTION to Remand by Cobalt International Energy, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scott, Robert)
April 1, 2019 Filing 78 JOINDER in #77 MOTION to Remand , filed by GAMCO Global Gold, Natural Resources & Income Trust, GAMCO Natural Resources, Gold & Income Trust. (Entwistle, Andrew)
April 1, 2019 Filing 77 MOTION to Remand by Cobalt International Energy, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Robert Scott, #2 Proposed Order)(Scott, Robert)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting #73 Motion for Michael S. Olsan to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #74 Motion for Zachery B. Roth to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
March 27, 2019 Filing 74 MOTION for Zachery B. Roth to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Allied World Assurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/17/2019. (Restrepo, Ronald)
March 27, 2019 Filing 73 MOTION for Michael S. Olsan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Allied World Assurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/17/2019. (Restrepo, Ronald)
March 26, 2019 Filing 72 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Beazley Insurance Company, filed.(Lane, Daniel)
March 25, 2019 Filing 71 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Alterra America Insurance Company, filed.(Economou, Cary)
March 25, 2019 Filing 70 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cobalt International Energy, Inc., filed.(Scott, Robert)
March 25, 2019 Filing 69 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Cobalt International Energy, Inc., filed.(Scott, Robert)
March 23, 2019 Filing 68 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by GAMCO Global Gold, Natural Resources & Income Trust, GAMCO Natural Resources, Gold & Income Trust, filed.(Entwistle, Andrew)
March 23, 2019 Filing 67 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GAMCO Global Gold, Natural Resources & Income Trust, GAMCO Natural Resources, Gold & Income Trust, filed.(Entwistle, Andrew)
March 22, 2019 Filing 66 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Aspen American Insurance Company, filed.(Moye, William)
March 22, 2019 Filing 65 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Endurance American Insurance Company, filed.(Mungia, Manuel)
March 22, 2019 Filing 64 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by North American Specialty Insurance Company, filed.(Knight, Frederic)
March 22, 2019 Filing 63 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by North American Specialty Insurance Company, filed.(Knight, Frederic)
March 22, 2019 Filing 62 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Beazley Insurance Company identifying Beazley plc as Corporate Parent, filed.(Lane, Daniel)
March 22, 2019 Filing 61 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Illinois National Insurance Company, filed.(Harrell, Robert)
March 22, 2019 Filing 60 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Illinois National Insurance Company, filed.(Harrell, Robert)
March 22, 2019 Filing 59 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Freedom Specialty Insurance Company identifying Scottsdale Insurance Company and Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company as Corporate Parent, filed.(Owens, Randall)
March 22, 2019 Filing 58 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by RSUI Indemnity Company, filed.(Draper, Tony)
March 22, 2019 Filing 57 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, filed.(Kavanagh, Craig)
March 22, 2019 Filing 56 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Continental Casualty Company, filed.(Jones, Leland)
March 22, 2019 Filing 55 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Continental Casualty Company identifying CNA Financial Corporation as Corporate Parent, filed.(Jones, Leland)
March 22, 2019 Filing 54 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Navigators Insurance Company identifying The Navigators Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Restrepo, Ronald)
March 22, 2019 Filing 53 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Navigators Insurance Company, filed.(Restrepo, Ronald)
March 22, 2019 Filing 52 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allied World Assurance Company identifying Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, GmbH and Fairfax Financial Holdings Ltd. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Restrepo, Ronald)
March 22, 2019 Filing 51 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Allied World Assurance Company, filed.(Restrepo, Ronald)
March 21, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION for Kevin G. Mikulaninec to Appear Pro Hac Vice by RSUI Indemnity Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/11/2019. (Draper, Tony)
March 21, 2019 Filing 49 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by RSUI Indemnity Company identifying RSUI Group, Inc.; Alleghany Insurance Holdings, LLC; and Alleghany Corporation as Corporate Parent, filed.(Draper, Tony)
March 21, 2019 Filing 48 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Endurance American Insurance Company, filed.(Mungia, Manuel)
March 21, 2019 Filing 47 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Federal Insurance Company identifying Chubb INA Holdings, Inc., Chubb Group Holdings, Inc., Chubb Limited as Corporate Parent, filed.(Savino, Angelo)
March 21, 2019 Filing 46 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Westchester Fire Insurance Company identifying Chubb US Holdings, Inc., Chubb Limited as Corporate Parent, filed.(Savino, Angelo)
March 21, 2019 Filing 45 First AMENDED ANSWER to by Federal Insurance Company, filed. (Savino, Angelo)
March 21, 2019 Filing 44 First AMENDED ANSWER to by Westchester Fire Insurance Company, filed. (Savino, Angelo)
March 20, 2019 Filing 43 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Aspen American Insurance Company identifying Apollo Global Management, LLC as Corporate Parent, filed.(Moye, William)
March 19, 2019 Filing 42 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Aspen American Insurance Company identifying Apollo Global Management, LLC as Corporate Parent, filed.(Moye, William)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Darius Kandawalla to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Susan Aldridge to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Daniel Layden to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4) (Main Document 39 replaced on 3/18/2019) (rguerrero, 4).
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Katelyn L. Mays to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Robert L. Ebby to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Ronald P. Schiller to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4)
March 18, 2019 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Freedom Specialty Insurance Company, filed.(Owens, Randall)
March 18, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION for Darius N. Kandawalla to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Freedom Specialty Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/8/2019. (Owens, Randall)
March 15, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for Robert P. Schiller to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Navigators Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/5/2019. (Restrepo, Ronald)
March 15, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Robert L. Ebby to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Navigators Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/5/2019. (Restrepo, Ronald)
March 15, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Katelyn L. Mays to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Navigators Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/5/2019. (Restrepo, Ronald)
March 15, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Daniel J. Layden to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Navigators Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/5/2019. (Restrepo, Ronald)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Marc Taylor Levesque terminated.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
March 15, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Susan C. Aldridge to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Beazley Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/5/2019. (Lane, Daniel)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Alexis J. Rogoski to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Rebecca Andursky to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
March 12, 2019 Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Arch Insurance Company identifying Arch Capital Group Ltd. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Schaar, Jill)
March 12, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Rebecca Amdursky to Appear Pro Hac Vice by North American Specialty Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/2/2019. (Knight, Frederic)
March 12, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Alexis J. Rogoski to Appear Pro Hac Vice by North American Specialty Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/2/2019. (Knight, Frederic)
March 12, 2019 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Alterra America Insurance Company identifying ultimate corporate parent is Markel Corporation as Corporate Parent, filed.(Economou, Cary)
March 12, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Marc Taylor Levesque to Withdraw as Attorney by Alterra America Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Economou, Cary)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting #11 Motion for Sabrina Haurin to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting #13 Motion for Craig Kavanagh to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Michael L. Manire to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
March 11, 2019 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company identifying Starr International Company, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Moye, William)
March 8, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Pooneh A. Momeni on behalf of North American Specialty Insurance Company, filed. (Knight, Frederic)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Telephone and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Counsel who filed or removed the action is responsible for placing the conference call and insuring that all parties are on the line. The call shall be placed to (713)250-5613. Telephone Conference set for 5/8/2019 at 08:45 AM before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
March 8, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Michael L. Manire to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/29/2019. (Moye, William)
March 8, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Craig W. Kavanagh to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/29/2019. (Moye, William)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Angelo G. Savino to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Federal Insurance Company and Westchester Fire Insurance Company. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
March 7, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Sabrina Haurin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Aspen American Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/28/2019. (Moye, William)
March 7, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Continental Casualty Company, filed.(Wilkins, Greg)
March 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Vanessa D. Durante on behalf of Federal Insurance Company, Westchester Fire Insurance Company, filed. (Durante, Vanessa)
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Angelo G. Savino to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Federal Insurance Company, Westchester Fire Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/28/2019. (Durante, Vanessa)
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 Letter Requesting Reassignment by Joseph H. Bryant, Cobalt International Energy, Inc., Peter R. Coneway, Henry Cornell, James W. Farnsworth, GAMCO Global Gold, Natural Resources & Income Trust, GAMCO Natural Resources, Gold & Income Trust, Jack E. Golden, N. John Lancaster, Jr., Jon A. Marshall, Kenneth W. Moore, Jr., J. Hardy Murchison, Kenneth A. Pontarelli, Myles W. Scoggins, William P. Utt, D. Jeff Van Steenbergen, John P. Wilkirson, Martin H. Young, filed.(Entwistle, Andrew)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leland H Jones IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Michael F. Perlis to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Alterra America Insurance Company.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leland H. Jones IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Continental Casualty Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/25/2019. (ehernandez, 5)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 JOINDER in #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,, , filed by Alterra America Insurance Company. (Levesque, Marc)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Michael F. Perlis to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alterra America Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/25/2019. (Levesque, Marc)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 125th District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 2016-31648 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21973262) filed by Allied World Assurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Index of Matters Being Filed, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Docket, #3 Exhibit C - Federal Court Docket from Prior Removal, #4 Exhibit D - List of All Counsel of Record, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit 11, #16 Exhibit 12, #17 Exhibit 13, #18 Exhibit 14, #19 Exhibit 15, #20 Exhibit 16, #21 Exhibit 17, #22 Exhibit 18, #23 Exhibit 19, #24 Exhibit 20, #25 Exhibit 21, #26 Exhibit 22, #27 Exhibit 23, #28 Exhibit 24, #29 Exhibit 25, #30 Exhibit 26, #31 Exhibit 27, #32 Exhibit 28, #33 Exhibit 29, #34 Exhibit 30, #35 Exhibit 31, #36 Exhibit 32, #37 Exhibit 33, #38 Exhibit 34, #39 Exhibit 35, #40 Exhibit 36, #41 Exhibit 37, #42 Exhibit 38, #43 Exhibit 39, #44 Exhibit 40, #45 Exhibit 41, #46 Exhibit 42, #47 Exhibit 43, #48 Exhibit 44, #49 Exhibit 45, #50 Exhibit 46, #51 Exhibit 47, #52 Exhibit 48, #53 Exhibit 49, #54 Exhibit 50, #55 Exhibit 51, #56 Exhibit 52, #57 Exhibit 53, #58 Exhibit 54, #59 Exhibit 55, #60 Exhibit 56, #61 Exhibit 57, #62 Exhibit 58, #63 Exhibit 59, #64 Exhibit 60, #65 Exhibit 61, #66 Exhibit 62, #67 Exhibit 63, #68 Exhibit 64, #69 Exhibit 65, #70 Exhibit 66, #71 Exhibit 67, #72 Exhibit 68, #73 Exhibit 69, #74 Exhibit 70, #75 Exhibit 71, #76 Exhibit 72, #77 Exhibit 73, #78 Exhibit 74, #79 Exhibit 75, #80 Exhibit 76, #81 Exhibit 77, #82 Exhibit 78, #83 Exhibit 79, #84 Exhibit 80, #85 Exhibit 81, #86 Exhibit 82, #87 Exhibit 83, #88 Exhibit 84, #89 Exhibit 85, #90 Exhibit 86, #91 Exhibit 87)(Restrepo, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cobalt International Energy, Inc. et al v. Illinois National Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Kenneth W. Moore, Jr.
Represented By: Barrett H Reasoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: GAMCO Global Gold, Natural Resources & Income Trust
Represented By: David R Stickney
Represented By: Andrew J. Entwistle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: N. John Lancaster, Jr.
Represented By: Barrett H Reasoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: William P. Utt
Represented By: Barrett H Reasoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: James W. Farnsworth
Represented By: Barrett H Reasoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Peter R. Coneway
Represented By: Barrett H Reasoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Henry Cornell
Represented By: Barrett H Reasoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Martin H. Young
Represented By: Barrett H Reasoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Myles W. Scoggins
Represented By: Barrett H Reasoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Jack E. Golden
Represented By: Barrett H Reasoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Joseph H. Bryant
Represented By: Barrett H Reasoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: GAMCO Natural Resources, Gold & Income Trust
Represented By: David R Stickney
Represented By: Andrew J. Entwistle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: D. Jeff Van Steenbergen
Represented By: Barrett H Reasoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Kenneth A. Pontarelli
Represented By: Barrett H Reasoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Jon A. Marshall
Represented By: Barrett H Reasoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: John P. Wilkirson
Represented By: Barrett H Reasoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: J. Hardy Murchison
Represented By: Barrett H Reasoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starr Indemnity & Liability Company
Represented By: Craig Walter Kavanagh
Represented By: Michael Latham Manire
Represented By: William R Moye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Frederic Daniel Knight
Represented By: Alexis J Rogoski
Represented By: Pooneh Azandaryani Momeni
Represented By: Rebecca Arndursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alterra America Insurance Company
Represented By: Cary Joy Economou
Represented By: Marc Taylor Levesque
Represented By: Michael F Perlis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Vanessa Dawn Durante
Represented By: Angelo G. Savino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endurance American Insurance Company
Represented By: Manuel Mungia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aspen American Insurance Company
Represented By: Sabrina C Haurin
Represented By: William R Moye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Insurance Company
Represented By: Jill Annette Schaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois National Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert S Harrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westchester Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Vanessa Dawn Durante
Represented By: Angelo G. Savino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freedom Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Randall Carroll Owens
Represented By: Darius N Kandawalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navigators Insurance Company
Represented By: Ronald Joseph Restrepo
Represented By: Daniel J. Layden
Represented By: Katelyn L. Mays
Represented By: Ronald Schiller
Represented By: Robert L. Ebby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beazley Insurance Company
Represented By: Susan C. Aldridge
Represented By: Daniel McNeel Lane, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RSUI Indemnity Company
Represented By: Tony L. Draper
Represented By: Kevin G. Mikulaninec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Allied World Assurance Company
Represented By: Ronald Joseph Restrepo
Represented By: Zachery B Roth
Represented By: Michael S Olsan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cobalt International Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Philip Scott, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Continental Casualty Company
Represented By: Leland Howard Jones, IV
Represented By: Greg C Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?