Samsonite Industries, Inc. d/b/a Metro EMS v. Azar
Plaintiff: Samsonite Industries, Inc. d/b/a Metro EMS and Samsonite Industries, Inc
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Case Number: 4:2019cv00742
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY in Support of #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Samsonite Industries, Inc. (Kennedy, Mark)
April 4, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition to #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Alex M. Azar, II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Proposed Order)(Vela, Jose)
March 26, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Samsonite Industries, Inc, filed.(Kennedy, Mark)
March 19, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Alex M. Azar, II served on 3/12/2019, answer due 5/13/2019, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Kennedy, Mark)
March 6, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(jguajardo, 4)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Alex M. Azar, II, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Kennedy, Mark)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/31/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Samsonite Industries, Inc. d/b/a Metro EMS, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Kennedy, Mark)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alex M. Azar, II (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21976211) filed by Samsonite Industries, Inc. d/b/a Metro EMS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Kennedy, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Samsonite Industries, Inc. d/b/a Metro EMS v. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samsonite Industries, Inc. d/b/a Metro EMS
Represented By: Mark Stephen Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samsonite Industries, Inc
Represented By: Mark Stephen Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Represented By: Jose Vela, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?