Farris et al v. Biomet, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Galina Farris and Michael Farris
Defendant: Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC and Biomet Orthopedics, L.L.C.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00764
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Vanessa D Gilmore
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting #102 Motion for Ruben I. Gonzalez to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
April 26, 2019 Filing 102 MOTION for Ruben I. Gonzalez to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, L.L.C., Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/17/2019. (Macaluso, Tricia)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting #100 Motion for Brenda Fulmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
April 12, 2019 Filing 100 MOTION for Brenda S. Fulmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Galina Farris, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/3/2019. (JenniferLongoria, 1)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting #96 MOTION for Matthew M. Garrett to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(olindor, 4)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting #97 MOTION for Heather L. Burgess to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(olindor, 4)
April 4, 2019 Filing 97 MOTION for Heather L. Burgess to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, L.L.C., Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/25/2019. (Macaluso, Tricia)
April 4, 2019 Filing 96 MOTION for Matthew M. Garrett to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, L.L.C., Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/25/2019. (Macaluso, Tricia)
March 22, 2019 Filing 95 First CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Galina Farris, Michael Farris, filed.(Kiziah, Katherine)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting #92 Motion for Katherine A. Kiziah to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(kpicota, 4)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Memorandum and Order Regarding Discovery Motions, Motions for Summary Judgment and Analogous Motions to Dismiss.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
March 20, 2019 Filing 92 MOTION for Katherine Kiziah to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Galina Farris, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/10/2019. (gsalinas, 5)
March 19, 2019 Filing 91 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, L.L.C., Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC identifying Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Macaluso, Tricia)
March 19, 2019 Filing 90 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, L.L.C., Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC identifying Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Macaluso, Tricia)
March 19, 2019 Filing 89 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, L.L.C., Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC identifying Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Macaluso, Tricia)
March 19, 2019 Filing 88 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, L.L.C., Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC identifying Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Macaluso, Tricia)
March 11, 2019 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by Tricia W. Macaluso on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, L.L.C., Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, filed. (Macaluso, Tricia)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/12/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4)
March 4, 2019 Filing 85 Case transferred in from Indiana Northern. Case Number 3:16-cv-00451; received electronically.
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 GROUP 3 TRANSFER ORDER AND EXPLANATION TO RECEIVING COURTS Pursuant to the court's prior orders and 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), this case is TRANSFERRED to the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/22/19. (jld)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR JANUARY 9, 2019 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for March 4, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. (EST). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/10/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
January 10, 2019 Filing 82 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/9/2019 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Navan Ward. Dft appeared by atty Erin Hanig, John Winter. Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for March 4, 2019 at 01:30 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) Modified on 1/11/2019 to correct date hearing held (jld). Modified on 2/1/2019 to correct date hearing held (dk).
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the status conference on January 9, 2019 at 1:15 p.m. (EST).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/7/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
November 19, 2018 Filing 80 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 11/15/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Brenda Fulmer. Dft appeared by atty John Winter, Erin Hanig. Topics discussed included status of discovery in Groups 6 and 7 and pending motions. Next status conference set for Wednesday, January 9, 2019 at 1:15 p.m. (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) Modified on 12/13/2018 to correct date of hearing (jld).
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER Concerning Remote Attendance at Status Conference; set for 11/15/2018 01:15 PM EST by telephone can join via conference call. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 11/9/2018. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(lpw)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER The court GRANTS the parties' joint motion for an extension of time to submit the proposed Remand Group 2 case list (Doc. No. 3723 ) to/including 10/5/2018. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 10/1/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER By agreement of the parties, the November 8 status conference is RESET for Thursday 11/15/2018 at 1:15 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/24/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR SEPTEMBER 19, 2018 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for November 8, 2018 at 1:15 p.m. (EST).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/21/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER The court GRANTS the defendants' 3178 Motion to add Attorneys J. Joseph Tanner, Adrienne Franco Busby, Andrew L. Campbell, and Stephanie N. Russo as Co-Liaison Counsel. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/19/2018. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
September 19, 2018 Filing 70 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 9/19/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty N. Ward and B. Fulmer (by phone). Dft appeared by atty E. Hanig, J. Winter, J. LaDue, J. Tanner (in person). The Court hears from parties. Written order to follow. The next Status Conference is set for 11/8/2018 at 1:15 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
September 18, 2018 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Adrienne Franco Busby on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC. (ksc)
September 18, 2018 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie N Russo on behalf of Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet, Inc(ksc)
September 18, 2018 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew L Campbell on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC. (ksc)
September 18, 2018 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by J Joseph Tanner on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC. (ksc)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the status conference on September 19, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. (E.D.T.). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/12/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER OF TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) AND EXPLANATION TO RECEIVING COURTS Pursuant to the court's prior orders and 28 USC 1404(a), the Clerk of Court is ORDERED TO TRANSFER the cases listed on Exhibit A to the venues agreed upon by the parties and designated in the order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/6/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
September 6, 2018 Filing 67 SUGGESTION OF REMAND/EXPLANATION TO TRANSFEROR COURTS Pursuant to 28 USC 1407(a) and Panel Rule 10.1(b), the court suggests that the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation remand the cases listed in Exhibit A to the districts from which they were transferred. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/6/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (A copy of this Order was emailed to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on 9/6/2018)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER VACATING DIRECT FILING PROVISION AND REQUESTING CESSATION OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFERS : Pursuant to the scheduling order issued on 4/23/18 Doc No. 3573 , the provisions in Section III of the 2/15/13 and 3/14/16 Case Mgmt Orders Doc. Nos. 242 and 3096 allowing direct filing in this Court are VACATED effective 9/1/18, and no direct filings will be allowed after that date. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/24/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER: The parties shall have to and including 8/31/18 to file any objections they may have to: (1) adding 3:13-CV-283, 3:13-CV-1017, 3:14-CV-1264, and 3:14-CV-1271 to the list of cases to be included in Remand Group 1, and (2) transferring all direct-filings to the jurisdictions identified in the proposed list and issuing a suggestion of remand in the cases listed above . Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/16/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER The Defendants' ( 3623 in 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG) Consent MOTION to reset Status Conference is GRANTED. The Status Conference is RESET 9/19/2018 at 1:30 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/26/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
July 18, 2018 Filing 63 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 7/18/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty A. Davis, N. Ward. Dft appeared by atty E. Hanig, J. LaDue, J. Winter. Topics discussed included status of Group 5 and 6 discovery, the proposed pretrial order on remand, upcoming expert video depositions, pro se cases and pending motions. Following discussion, the court directed plaintiff's counsel to file any motion to enforce settlement in Simpson v. Biomet, 3:16cv466, by Aug 9, 2018. Next status conference set for Aug 27, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. (EDT) before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
July 16, 2018 Filing 62 ANSWER to #60 Amended Complaint, by Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction LLC, Biomet, Inc..(Hanig, Erin)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Remote Attendance Order for July 18, 2018 Status Conference Call in information for the hearing on 7/18/2018 at 1:30 PM (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/12/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
July 5, 2018 Filing 60 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction LLC, Biomet, Inc., filed by Galina Farris, Individually and as Independent Administratrix of the Estate of Michael Wayne Farris and as next friend of VAF Minor.(mlc)
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #58 Motion to Substitute Party and for leave to file an amended complaint. The court DIRECTS the clerk of the court to docket Doc. No. 58-3 as the plaintiffs amended complaint and deem it filed as of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/5/18. (mlc)
June 19, 2018 Filing 58 MOTION to Substitute Party and Amend Complaint by Plaintiff Galina Farris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Fulmer PHV, Brenda)
May 29, 2018 Filing 57 Docket Annotation: The Dismissal Order entered on 5/29/2018 related to only three member cases, but was inadvertently docketed in all pending member cases. To avoid confusion and correct the error, the original entry [Doc. No. 3593 ] was deleted from the master and all member case dockets, and the order was redocketed in 3:12md2391 [Doc. No. 3596 ] and the related member cases (3:13cv1243, 3:14cv1243, and 3:16cv170).Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
May 17, 2018 Filing 56 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 5/17/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Brenda Fulmer. Dft appeared by atty John Winter and John LaDue. The Court hears from parties. A Status Conference is set for 7/18/2018 at 1:30 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter J. Hoffman.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the May 17, 2018 status conference.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/9/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 SCHEDULING ORDER - This order activates Group 6 (Exh. A) for case specific discovery purposes and establishes deadlines for winding up the MDL proceedings. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/23/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(ksc)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING 3560 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Parties given to and including April 11, 2018 to file the joint proposed scheduling order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/10/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER By agreement of the parties, the court established deadlines and a schedule for briefing summary judgment motions in the cases identified in Exhibits A, B, and C to this order. See order for details.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/29/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING IN PART Plaintiffs Steering Committee's request to take video depositions of its generic expert witnesses, and DIRECTING parties to submit proposed agreed scheduling order by April 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/26/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR MARCH 12, 2018 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for Thursday, May 17, 2018 at 1:00 p.m. (EDT).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/14/2018. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
March 12, 2018 Filing 49 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 3/12/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by attys Jasper Ward (in person), Brenda Fulmer and Ahmad Diab (by phone). Dft appeared by attys Erin Hanig, John LaDue, and John Winter (all in person). The Court hears from parties. Status Conference set for 5/17/2018 at 1:00 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Written order to follow.(Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 OPINION AND ORDER Biomets 3388 motions for summary judgment related to the Taper, ReCap, and metal-on-polyethylene devices is DENIED on the merits; Biomets 3390 motions for summary judgment relating to the state-of-the-art defense is DENIED, without prejudice; If the plaintiffs in White v. Biomet (3:16cv115) and Glynn v. Biomet (3:15cv491) wish to take device-specific expert depositions, they should file a motion to that effect within 14 days from the date of this order, and should indicate in that motion whether local counsel will conduct the deposition, with or without the assistance of the Plaintiffs Steering Committee. The plaintiffs in the Price v. Biomet (3:14cv275) and Gearon v. Biomet (3:14cv2099) shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file a motion to amend the scheduling order to allow device-specific expert depositions or, alternatively, a motion for suggestion of remand. If they elect the later, the Plaintiffs Steering Committee should address the effect, if any, remand would have on the plaintiffs obligations under the December 7,2015 Amended Holdback Order 3022 in its response. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/8/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR JANUARY 30, 2018 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of the topics discussed and actions taken. The next Status Conference is set for 3/12/2018 at 1:30 PM (EDT)in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/1/18. (Copy mailed to pro se parties)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
January 30, 2018 Filing 46 TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/30/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Brenda Fulmer (in person), Ahmed Diab and Justin Presnal (by phone). Dft appeared by atty Erin Linder and John LaDue (in person), John Winter (by phone). The next Status Conference is set for 3/12/2018 at 1:30 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Written order to follow.(Court Reporter Debra Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Remote Attendance Order for January 30, 2018 Telephonic Status Conference Call-in information for the telephonic status conference on January 30, 2018 at 1:30 pm (EDT).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/25/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER The Joint Motion to Amend Group 5 Case List 3491 is GRANTED, and the the pool of cases listed on Amended Exhibit A is SUBSTITUTED as Group 5 for case-specific discovery. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/8/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
December 21, 2017 Filing 43 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 3381 Executive Committee's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of Biomet's expert Steven R. Schmid; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 3382 the Executive Committee's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of Biomet expert David Schroeder; DENYING 3383 the Executive Committee's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of Biomet's expert Daniel Schultz, M.D.; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 3384 the Executive Committee's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of Biomet's expert Andrew I Spitzer, M.D.; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 3385 the Executive Committee's Motion to exclude opinions and testimony of Biomet's expert Dr. Kenneth St. John; DENYING 3386 Biomet's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of the plaintiffs' expert Mari Truman; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 3399 Biomet's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of the plaintiffs' expert George S Kantor, M.D. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER ACTIVATING GROUP 5 DISCOVERY Identifies cases to be included in Group 5 for purposes of case-specific discovery and related deadlines. Completed and updated medical records authorizations to be provided to Biomet by 2/2/2018. Case-specific Discovery deadline is 9/14/2018.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/18/17. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER On the court's own motion and without objection, the telephonic status conference originally set for 12/19/2017 is now RESET for Tuesday, 1/30/2018 at 1:30 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/18/17. (Copy mailed to pro se parties)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the 12/19/2017 status conference at 1:30 pm (EST). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/12/17. (Copy mailed to pro se parties)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
October 26, 2017 Filing 39 TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 10/26/2017 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty B. Fulmer. Dft appeared by atty J. LaDue. The Court hears from the parties. Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/19/2017 at 1:30 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the Oct. 26, 2017 status conference at 1:30 pm (EDT).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 10/23/17. (Copy mailed to pro se parties)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR AUGUST 24, 2017 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. The next status conference is set for Thursday, October 26, 2017 at 1:30 PM (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/28/17. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE : Call-in information for the August 24, 2017 status conference at 1:00 pm (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/18/2017. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR JULY 13, 2017 STATUS CONFERENCE , Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Parties to submit recommendations regarding procedures for handling new referrals and culminating proceedings by August 17, 2017. Next status conference set for August 24, 2017 at 1:00 p.m. (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/14/17. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the July 13, 2017 status conference at 9:30 am (EDT).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/10/17. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING ( 3354 ) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG. The defendants shall have to and including 7/31/2017 to file any motion directed at the admissibility of Dr. Kantor's testimony under Federal Rule of Evidence 702. Response due by 8/31/17 and Reply to be filed by 9/11/2017. Signed by Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/15/17. (Copy mailed to pro se party)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
April 28, 2017 Set Hearings: Status Conference set for 7/13/2017 09:30 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR APRIL 24, 2017 PRO SE HEARING AND STATUS CONFERENCE Brenda Fulmer appeared for the plaintiffs; John Winter, John LaDue, and Erin Linder Hanig appeared for the defendants. Topics addressed included the pro se and Metal-on-Polyethylene (MoP) cases, active case count, status of discovery in Groups 3 and 4, and pending motions with actions taken in specific case as set forth in the Order. The next status conference is set for 7/13/2017 at 9:30 am (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/28/17. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
April 24, 2017 Filing 31 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 4/24/2017 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Plas appeared by atty Brenda Fulmer. Dfts appeared by atty John Winter, John LaDue, and Erin Hanig. Roland Jarquio appears on behalf of Nabileh & Ramon Jarquio (3:13cv933). The Court hears from parties. A Status Conference is set for 7/13/2017 at 9:30 AM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Written order to follow.(Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the April 24, 2017 telephonic status conference at 1:30 p.m. (E.D.T.). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/21/17. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
March 28, 2017 Filing 29 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 3/28/2017 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Ahmed Diab, Brenda Fulmer, and Justin Presnal. Dft appeared by atty John Winter, Erin Hanig, and John LaDue. The parties advised the court on the status of active/unresolved cases and discovery; indicated that they had reached an agreement regarding the composition of Group 4 for discovery purposes and would be submitting a proposed order by early April, with scheduling deadlines to be determined by the court; and confirmed that the hearing regarding management of the remaining pro se cases would proceed as scheduled on April 24, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. (EDT). The court set the next status conference for April 24, 2017, following the pro se case management hearing. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the March 28, 2017 telephonic status conference at 1:30 p.m. (E.D.T.). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/23/17. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER On the courts own motion and without objection, the telephonic status conference currently set for February 27, 2017 is RESET for Tuesday, March 28, 2017, at 1:30 p.m. (E.D.T.). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/23/17. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR DECEMBER 15, 2016 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for 2/27/2017 09:30 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/15/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR NOVEMBER 7, 2016 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed. Parties to submit proposed scheduling order re: Group 3 by Nov 11. Next status conference set for December 15, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. (E.S.T.). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 11/28/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
November 28, 2016 Filing 24 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(Hanig, Erin)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER RE: GROUP 3, MANAGEMENT OF PRO SE CASES, AND STATE COURT COORDINATION I OVERRULE the objection to including the Gearon case in Group 3; GRANT the motion (DE 121 in 3:15cv13) to include the Zamora case in Group 3; DECLINE to order inclusion of the ten year cases in Group 3; and propose to issue a modified Lone Pine order and letter to state judges. If no suggestions for improvement are received by November 23, I will issue the Lone Pine order and direct the letters to be sent. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 11/15/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
November 7, 2016 Filing 22 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 11/7/2016 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Plaintiffs appeared by atty B. Fulmer, N. Ward, A. Diab (by phone), J. Ward (by phone). Defendants appeared by atty J. Winter, J. LaDue, E. Hanig, J. Kashman. Court hears from parties. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 12/15/2016 at 9:00 AM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Written memorandum to follow. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER : GRANTING 3225 PSCII's unopposed Motion to Appoint a Second Escrow Agent and Fee Committee. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 10/28/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER The Plaintiffs' Steering Committee and Biomet are invited to provide a brief explanation for its recommendation regarding the cases to be included in Group 3. The ruling on the joint request to activate Group 3 is DEFERRED until 10/28/2016. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 10/6/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER The court will DEFER ruling on the Plaintiffs Steering Committee's Motion to Appoint a Second Escrow Agent and Fee Committee ( 3225 in 3:12md2391) until 10/27/2016 to afford the individual plaintiffs time to respond or object to the motion. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 10/6/2016. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
September 9, 2016 Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. Magistrate Judge Christopher A Nuechterlein no longer assigned to case. (mlf)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Plaintiffs' Steering Committee to submit proposed order re: appointment of Escrow Agent by Sep 23, 2016. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/31/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Parties shall have until Sep 23, 2016 to confer, identify for the court which, if any, of the cases listed in Exhibit A should be designated as active and unsettled, and submit a proposal regarding disposition of the remaining cases. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/31/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR AUGUST 29, 2016 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed. Parties to submit proposed list of cases to be included in Group 3 for case-specific discovery purposes. PSCII to submit alternative to Lone Pine order in pro se cases within 30 days; Biomet's response due 30 days after receipt. Parties to confer and submit proposed second show cause order. Ruling on Biomet's request to issue state court coordination letter 3172 deferred. Next status conference set for November 7, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. (E.S.T.). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/31/2016. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld)
August 29, 2016 Filing 15 TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 8/29/2016 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty B. Fulmer, J. Presnal, N. Ward, A. Davis, and K. Barton for A. Diab. Dft appeared by atty J. Winter, J. LaDue, and E. Hanig. The Court hears from parties. Status Conference set for 11/7/2016 at 1:30 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Written memorandum to follow. (Court Reporter D. Bonk) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT 8/29/16 STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for August 29, 2016 hearing at 11:00 a.m. (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/25/2016. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(lns)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The court VACATES the referral to Magistrate Judge Nuechterlein, and REFERS this matter to Magistrate Judge Michael Gotsch to determine any pretrial matters and to conduct such proceedings as are required, and, when appropriate, to enter into the record proposed findings of fact and recommendations for the disposition of this case, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Local Rule 72-1. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/17/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld)
August 10, 2016 Filing 12 TELEPHONIC HEARING on PSC's request to extend custodial depositions deadline was held on 8/10/2016 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty A. Diab, N. Ward, J. Presnall. Dft appeared by atty J. LaDue, E. Hanig. Arguments heard. For the reasons stated in open court the request to extend the deadline is DENIED. If previously undisclosed documents are produced in the Florida case that would justify reopening a deposition, the court will entertain a motion to reopen and to assess costs. SO ORDERED. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld)
August 8, 2016 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc..(Hanig, Erin)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT 8/10/16 DISCOVERY HEARING Call-in information for August 10, 2016 hearing at 1:30 p.m. (E.D.T.).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/4/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER On the court's own motion, the telephonic status conference on 8/29/2016 is RESET for 11:00 AM (EDT) This is a time change only. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/28/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER The parties have advised the court that there are no disputed issues regarding discovery. Accordingly the July 28, 2016 telephonic hearing is VACATED. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/28/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld)
July 26, 2016 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re (3172 in 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN) MOTION Requesting Issuance of State Court Coordination Letter filed by Alex C Davis. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(Davis PHV, Alexander)
July 18, 2016 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OF 7/14/2016 STATUS CONFERENCE , Following discussion the court set telephonic hearings on 7/28/2016 at 2:00 PM (EDT) and 8/10/2016 at 1:30 PM (EDT)in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. to resolve any discovery-related issues that may arise; and set a Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/29/2016 at 11:30 AM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/18/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld)
July 14, 2016 Filing 5 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 7/14/2016 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty N. Ward (in person) and A. Diab and B. Fulmer by phone.. Dft appeared by atty E. Hanig (in person) and J. Winter by phone. The court hears from parties. Telephonic Discovery hearings set 7/28/2016 at 2:00 PM (EDT) and 8/10/2016 at 1:30 PM (EDT) before Judge Miller. Status conference set 8/29/2016 at 11:30 AM (EDT) before Judge Miller. Written memorandum to follow. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld)
July 13, 2016 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Linder Hanig on behalf of Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc. (Hanig, Erin)
July 13, 2016 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John D LaDue on behalf of Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc. (LaDue, John)
July 12, 2016 Judge Robert L Miller, Jr and Magistrate Judge Christopher A Nuechterlein added. (NEW CASE) (mlc)
July 11, 2016 Filing 2 NOTICE by Galina Farris, Michael Farris of Related Case (Fulmer PHV, Brenda)
July 11, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-2987463.), filed by Michael Farris, Galina Farris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fulmer PHV, Brenda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farris et al v. Biomet, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Inc
Represented By: Stephanie N Russo
Represented By: Adrienne Franco Busby
Represented By: J. Joseph Tanner
Represented By: John D LaDue
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Represented By: Andrew L Campbell
Represented By: Matthew Mark Garrett
Represented By: Heather L Burgess
Represented By: Tricia Wisenbaker Macaluso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Manufacturing, LLC
Represented By: John D LaDue
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Represented By: Matthew Mark Garrett
Represented By: Heather L Burgess
Represented By: Tricia Wisenbaker Macaluso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC
Represented By: John D LaDue
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Represented By: Matthew Mark Garrett
Represented By: Heather L Burgess
Represented By: Tricia Wisenbaker Macaluso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Orthopedics, L.L.C.
Represented By: Stephanie N Russo
Represented By: Adrienne Franco Busby
Represented By: J. Joseph Tanner
Represented By: John D LaDue
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Represented By: Andrew L Campbell
Represented By: Matthew Mark Garrett
Represented By: Heather L Burgess
Represented By: Tricia Wisenbaker Macaluso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Galina Farris
Represented By: Brenda S Fulmer PHV
Represented By: Katherine A. Kiziah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Farris
Represented By: Brenda S Fulmer PHV
Represented By: Katherine A. Kiziah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?