Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Samson, et al

Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Michael N. Samson and Milspec Services Pty Ltd. a/k/a Milspec Services, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00812
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Michael N. Samson served on 3/21/2019, answer due 4/11/2019, filed.(Crooks, David)
April 1, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Milspec Services Pty Ltd. a/k/a Milspec Services, Inc. served on 3/21/2019, answer due 4/11/2019, filed.(Crooks, David)
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed.(Crooks, David)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/7/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
March 7, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(jguajardo, 4)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Milspec Services Pty Ltd. a/k/a Milspec Services, Inc., filed.(Crooks, David)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Michael N. Samson, filed.(Crooks, David)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT in Interpleader against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22005014) filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Crooks, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Samson, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael N. Samson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milspec Services Pty Ltd. a/k/a Milspec Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: David Grant Crooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?