Moreno v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Blas Moreno
Defendant: BP America Production Company and BP Exploration & Production, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01081
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/24/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 3A before Judge Keith P Ellison(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (ltien, 4)
March 22, 2019 Filing 11 Case electronically transferred in from Louisiana Eastern. Case Number 2:18-cv-11099. (ltien, 4)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 3/20/2019. (NEF: Sect J)(caa)
March 18, 2019 Filing 9 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Deadlines. It is accordingly ORDERED that the deadline for Plaintiff to provide Defendants with his Initial Disclosures including the Plaintiff Profile Form, Original Signed Authorizations, and Medical Records is extended by thirty days, or until Monday, March 18, 2019. It is further ORDERED that the deadline for Defendants to file their joint venue stipulation has been extended to thirty days from the date Plaintiff provides his required disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 2/20/2019.(mmv)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying without prejudice to refiling #6 Motion for Extension of Deadlines. The motion neither certifies that there is no opposition to the requested extension, nor is noticed for submission as required by LocalRule 7.2, if it is opposed. Plaintiff may re-file this motion either with counsel's certification that there is no opposition to the extension or, if it is opposed, noticing it for submission.Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 2/20/2019. (caa)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Deadlines by Blas Moreno. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Amaro, Randolph) Modified on 2/15/2019 (cg).
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Deadlines by Blas Moreno. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Amaro, Randolph) Modified on 2/15/2019 (cg).
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(cg)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7239042) filed by Blas Moreno. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Randolph James Amaro, Jr added to party Blas Moreno(pty:pla).(Amaro, Randolph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moreno v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blas Moreno
Represented By: Randolph James Amaro, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Represented By: Kevin Michael Hodges
Represented By: Don Keller Haycraft
Represented By: Catherine Pyune McEldowney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Michael Hodges
Represented By: Don Keller Haycraft
Represented By: Catherine Pyune McEldowney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?