Salcetti v. AIG Property Casualty Company

Plaintiff: Robert Salcetti
Defendant: AIG Property Casualty Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv01184
Filed: April 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Nancy F Atlas
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Filing 6 First AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by AIG Property Casualty Company, filed. (Gregory, Raymond)
April 18, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Robert Salcetti, filed.(Garcia, Jesus)
April 3, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by AIG Property Casualty Company, filed.(Gregory, Raymond)
April 3, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by AIG Property Casualty Company, filed.(Gregory, Raymond)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/29/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4)
April 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 61st District Court - Harris County, case number 2019-16282 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22153498) filed by AIG Property Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Matters Being Filed, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Executed Process, #4 Exhibit Pleadings on file, #5 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet, #6 Exhibit List of Counsel of Record)(Gregory, Raymond)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salcetti v. AIG Property Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Salcetti
Represented By: Jesus Garcia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG Property Casualty Company
Represented By: Raymond L Gregory, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?