Munoz et al v. Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC
Plaintiff: Sandra Reyes, A C, a Minor, M H, III, a Minor, E M, a Minor, Julie Muniz, Felix Herrera, Janet Villanueva, Marissa Bingham, Daisy Villanueva, Marissa Salinas, J S, a Minor, Lizette Velez, Charles Wayne Collins, Gary Landery, Deborah Cron, Deanna Harper-Conley, Felicia Williams, Abelardo Sanchez, Fabiola Bueno, I G, a Minor, G M B, a Minor, John Novelli, Chastity Parino, Justin Braly, E D, a Minor, Matias Reinhardt, Leo Bueno, Angel Guzman, Deborah Gamel, Benilde Hernandez, Gary Chiarlone, A H, a Minor, J H, a Minor, A D, a Minor, J D, a Minor, D'Andre Jackson, II, L H, a Minor, Consuelo Garcia Saenz, Isaac Garza, Daniel Hernandez, D G, a Minor, James Bingham, M H, II, a Minor, M H I, a Minor, Rogelio Lopez Munoz, Sandra Gonzales, Renee Hernandez, Asadulla Khan, Breccia Carmona, Violet Perales, S G, a Minor, A G, a Minor, T C, a Minor, Julio DeLeon, Vopak Terminal Deer Park Inc., Jeffrey Aaron and Veronica Cantu
Defendant: Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC
Consolidated Plaintiff: Refugio Reyes, Stephanie Ochoa, Danny Smith, Matthew Roberts, Rose Mary Mottu, Swim Houston Pool Management L L C, Harn Lee, Tyana Bailey, Lydia Urbina, Mary Ann Bridge, Norma Mottu, Gwendolyn Tennard, Lisa Linsicombe, John M Garza, Jr., Amanda Morales, Teresa Daigle, Oletha Brown, Nancy Nguyen, Yehya Yaman, Amanda Bryant, Destrea Armstrong, Charles Watts, Jr., Brian Wayne, Adal Salaam, Michael Walker, Nelda Bates, Pablo Mendez, Veronica Coleman, Ruben Olmos, John M Garza, III, Justin Connor, John Badera, Kerschen D. Woolridge, Pedro Perez Fernandez, Lynn Maughmer, Rhena Hernandez, R. N., a Minor, Cassandra Shepard, First Coast Logistics, Inc., Victoria Salas, Shantea Nelson, Lorena DiBello, G.D., Bradley Baxter, A.D., Robert Steckler, Raymond Nelson, Rosmer Villalobos Diaz, Yesenia Diaz, Monique Woolridge, C.D., Abel Arguelles, Bradford Atchison, Luciano Adame, Estuardo Alecio, Jeremiah Aguilar, Kolmar Americas, Inc.,, David Adair, Brickey Juan Manuel, G D, C D, Meshal Alexander, Juan Acevedo, Alexis Alexander, Gregory Alexander, Archie Advinicula, Melquisha Adams, Ramiro Aguirre and Coal City Cob Company, Inc.
Consolidated Defendant: Mitsui & Company, Alice Richardson, Mitsui & Co (U S A) Inc, Intercontinental Terminals Management Company and Bernt A. Netland
Case Number: 4:2019cv01460
Filed: April 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Hoyt
Referring Judge: Dena Hanovice Palermo
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER Regarding Motions before Judge Palermo. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2020 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 702 before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo(Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER Setting Mitsui's Rule 12(B)(2) Motion Deadlines. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 179 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Status Conference held ERO: L. Howard. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4)
January 17, 2020 Filing 178 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Intercontinental Terminals Management Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Knight, Frederic)
January 17, 2020 Filing 177 PROPOSED ORDER - Letter to Case Manager for Judge Palermo, filing Proposed Case Management and Scheduling Order, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order - Proposed Case Management and Scheduling Order)(Lewis, Russell)
January 16, 2020 Filing 176 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time for Plaintiff, Robert Steckler, to Complete and Serve His Fact SheetMotions referred to Dena Hanovice Palermo. by Bradford Atchison, Bradley Baxter, C.D., Justin Connor, Rosmer Villalobos Diaz, Yesenia Diaz, Pedro Perez Fernandez, G.D., Lynn Maughmer, Victoria Salas, Cassandra Shepard, Robert Steckler, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Second Motion for Extension)(Sampson, Phillip)
January 16, 2020 terminated #119 Stipulation. Mooted by #136 (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4)
January 16, 2020 Filing 175 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time for Plaintiff, Robert Steckler, to Complete and Serve His Fact SheetMotions referred to Dena Hanovice Palermo. by A.D., Bradford Atchison, Bradley Baxter, C.D., Justin Connor, Rosmer Villalobos Diaz, Yesenia Diaz, Pedro Perez Fernandez, G.D., Benilde Hernandez, Daniel Hernandez, Lynn Maughmer, Victoria Salas, Cassandra Shepard, Robert Steckler, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Second Motion for Extension)(Sampson, Phillip)
January 16, 2020 Filing 174 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Juan Acevedo, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Willis, Matthew)
January 16, 2020 Filing 173 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Kerschen D. Woolridge, Monique Woolridge, filed.(Weycer, Mark)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motions #15 #17 #20 #21 and #22 . (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER Dismissing Kolmar Americas, Inc.'s Complaint without Prejudice in Civil Action 4:19-cv-03609 #158 Notice of Dismissal. Counter-Plaintiff, Kolmar Americas, Inc., is terminated.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
January 14, 2020 Filing 170 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by R. N., a Minor, Raymond Nelson, Shantea Nelson, filed.(Essmyer, Michael)
January 13, 2020 Filing 169 PLAINTIFFS REPLY SUPPORTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT ADDING NON-DIVERSE DEFENDANTS AND REMAND by C D, C.D., Justin Connor, A D, a Minor, Rosmer Villalobos Diaz, Yesenia Diaz, Pedro Perez Fernandez, G D, G.D., Lynn Maughmer, Victoria Salas, Cassandra Shepard, Robert Steckler, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Speed, Spencer) Modified on 1/14/2020 (cfelchak, 4).
January 13, 2020 Filing 168 REPLY in Support of #156 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaints, filed by Abel Arguelles, Rhena Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(McGovern, Owen)
January 10, 2020 Filing 166 STATUS REPORT by Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC, filed.(Lewis, Russell)
January 9, 2020 Filing 167 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Mary S. DiRago as to Kolmar Americas, Inc., re: #112 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,, filed. (RTS; Undeliverable as Addressed)(sguevara, 4)
January 8, 2020 Filing 165 Plaintiff's Fact Sheet by Refugio Reyes, filed.(Ogden, William)
January 6, 2020 Filing 164 JOINDER in #163 Response to Motion,, to Plaintiffs' Consolidated Motion for Leave to Amend Complaints Adding Non-Diverse Defendants and Remand, filed by Mitsui & Co (U S A) Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Thompson, James)
January 6, 2020 Filing 163 RESPONSE to #156 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaints filed by Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Appendix - Index to Unpublished Cases, #9 Appendix - Tab A, #10 Appendix - Tab B, #11 Appendix - Tab C, #12 Appendix - Tab D, #13 Appendix - Tab E, #14 Appendix - Tab F, #15 Appendix - Tab G, #16 Appendix - Tab H, #17 Appendix - Tab I, #18 Appendix - Tab J, #19 Appendix - Tab K, #20 Appendix - Tab L, #21 Proposed Order)(Lewis, Russell)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting #159 ITC's Motion to Enforce Court Order and denying #143 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #153 Motion to Amend Summary Judgment; and denying #154 Motion to Submit Medical Records. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(Palermo, J.)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting #157 Robert Steckler's Motion for Extension of Time To Serve Fact Sheet due by 1/6/2020.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(Palermo, J.)
December 30, 2019 Filing 160 PROPOSED ORDER re: #158 Notice of Dismissal, filed.(Garcia, Juan)
December 20, 2019 Filing 159 Motion to Enforce Court Order and RESPONSE to #143 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #154 MOTION Motion to Submit Medical Records, #153 MOTION to Amend #143 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lewis, Russell) Modified on 12/30/2019 (dpalermo, ).
December 19, 2019 Filing 158 NOTICE of Dismissal as to Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC by Kolmar Americas, Inc.,, filed. (Garcia, Juan)
December 18, 2019 Filing 157 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Serve Fact Sheet of Robert StecklerMotions referred to Dena Hanovice Palermo. by Bradford Atchison, Bradley Baxter, Justin Connor, Rosmer Villalobos Diaz, Yesenia Diaz, Pedro Perez Fernandez, Lynn Maughmer, Victoria Salas, Cassandra Shepard, Robert Steckler, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Fact Sheet of Robert Steckler)(Sampson, Phillip)
December 16, 2019 Filing 156 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Amended ComplaintsMotions referred to Dena Hanovice Palermo. by Norma Mottu, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Chart, #2 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #8 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #9 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #10 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #11 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #12 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #13 Exhibit List of Plaintiffs, #14 Proposed Order)(Agosto, Bernardino)
December 12, 2019 Filing 155 Letter from Brickey Juan Manuel re: requesting copy of updated Docket Sheet., filed. (Docket Sheet mailed to Mr. Manuel via Regular Mail.) (JessicaVillarreal, 3)
December 12, 2019 Filing 154 MOTION to Submit Medical RecordsMotions referred to Dena Hanovice Palermo. by Brickey Juan Manuel, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted attachment, #2 Envelope)(JessicaVillarreal, 3)
December 12, 2019 Filing 153 MOTION to Amend #143 MOTION for Summary Judgment Motions referred to Dena Hanovice Palermo. by Brickey Juan Manuel, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/2/2020. (JessicaVillarreal, 3)
December 12, 2019 Filing 152 NOTICE of Change of Address by Brickey Juan Manuel, filed. (Address Updated.)(JessicaVillarreal, 3)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER Striking Document re: #145 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to serve fact sheet. Does not comply with Order (Dkt. No. 99).(Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4)
December 6, 2019 Filing 150 NOTICE of Service of Plaintiffs' Fact Sheets by Norma Mottu, filed. (Agosto, Bernardino)
December 6, 2019 Filing 149 NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff Fact Sheet by Destrea Armstrong, filed. (Foty, Donny)
December 6, 2019 Filing 148 NOTICE of Service of Plaintiffs' Fact Sheets by Abel Arguelles, John Badera, Rhena Hernandez, filed. (Fox, Shawn)
December 6, 2019 Filing 147 NOTICE of Service of Plaintiffs Fact Sheets by Amanda Bryant, filed. (Underwood, Mark)
December 6, 2019 Filing 146 Unopposed PROPOSED ORDER Granting Extension of Time to Serve Fact Sheet of Robert Steckler re: #145 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to serve fact sheet, filed.(Houssiere, Charles)
December 6, 2019 Filing 145 **Stricken from Record*** Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to serve fact sheetMotions referred to Dena Hanovice Palermo. by Robert Steckler, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/27/2019. (Houssiere, Charles) Modified on 12/10/2019 (cfelchak, 4).
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER Striking Document re: #138 MOTION to Amend. Fails to comply with Paragraph E of the Order Regarding Plaintiffs Unopposed Second Amended Motion for Approval of Leadership Structure #99 Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER denying #123 Motion to Subpoena Medical Records; denying #130 Motion for Disclosure; denying #131 Motion Allow Witnesses and Subpoena; denying #132 Motion for Admissions Motions; denying #133 Motion for Interrogatories Motions ; denying #134 Motion for Production of Documents; denying #135 Motion for Teleconference/Video Conference (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4)
December 4, 2019 Filing 139 NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff Fact Sheets by Cassandra Shepard, filed. (Kauffman, Randal)
December 4, 2019 Filing 138 **STRICKEN from Record**** MOTION to Amend Motions referred to Dena Hanovice Palermo. by Norma Mottu, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave)(Agosto, Bernardino) Modified on 12/5/2019 (cfelchak, 4).
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER re: #136 Amended Stipulation regarding Jurisdictional Discovery to be served on Mitsui & Co. USA Inc.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4) (Main Document 137 replaced on 12/4/2019) (cfelchak, 4).
November 29, 2019 Filing 144 Letter from Brickey Juan Manuel re: Request for copy of docket sheet, filed. (JenniferOlson, 4) Docket sheet mailed on December 6. Modified on 12/5/2019 (JenniferOlson, 4).
November 29, 2019 Filing 143 MOTION for Summary Judgment Motions referred to Dena Hanovice Palermo. by Brickey Juan Manuel, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/20/2019. (JenniferOlson, 4)
November 29, 2019 Filing 142 Letter from Brickey Juan Manuel re: Request for Order allowing him time in the TDCJ law library, filed. (JenniferOlson, 4)
November 27, 2019 Filing 136 STIPULATION re: Amended Joint Stipulation Regarding Jurisdictional Discovery by Mitsui & Co (U S A) Inc, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Regarding Jurisdictional Discovery)(Thompson, James)
November 25, 2019 Filing 135 MOTION for Teleconference/Video Conference Conference Motions referred to Dena Hanovice Palermo. by Brickey Juan Manuel, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/16/2019. (sguevara, 4)
November 25, 2019 Filing 134 MOTION for Production of DocumentsMotions referred to Dena Hanovice Palermo. by Brickey Juan Manuel, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/16/2019. (sguevara, 4)
November 25, 2019 Filing 133 MOTION for InterrogatoriesMotions referred to Dena Hanovice Palermo. by Brickey Juan Manuel, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/16/2019. (sguevara, 4)
November 25, 2019 Filing 132 MOTION for AdmissionsMotions referred to Dena Hanovice Palermo. by Brickey Juan Manuel, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/16/2019. (sguevara, 4)
November 25, 2019 Filing 131 MOTION to Allow Witnesses and Subpoena Them for TrialMotions referred to Dena Hanovice Palermo. by Brickey Juan Manuel, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/16/2019. (sguevara, 4)
November 25, 2019 Filing 130 MOTION for DisclosureMotions referred to Dena Hanovice Palermo. by Brickey Juan Manuel, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 cover letter, #2 Envelope)(sguevara, 4)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting #122 MOTION for Gabriel A. Assaad to Withdraw as Attorney (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Telephone Conference held Appearances: Lead Counsel for Plaintiffs and Defendants. Ct Reporter: ERO. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4)
November 22, 2019 Filing 126 CERTIFICATE of Conference re: #122 MOTION for Gabriel A. Assaad to Withdraw as Attorney by Destrea Armstrong, filed.(Foty, Donny)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 125 SCHEDULING ORDER. Status Conference set for 1/17/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 702 before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo(Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER Telephone Conference set for 11/22/2019 at 10:15 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo(Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4)
November 20, 2019 Filing 127 MOTION to Subpoena Medical Records. Motions referred to Dena Hanovice Palermo. by Brickey Juan Manuel, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/11/2019. (ShoshanaArnow, 4)
November 19, 2019 Filing 122 MOTION for Gabriel A. Assaad to Withdraw as AttorneyMotions referred to Dena Hanovice Palermo. by Destrea Armstrong, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Foty, Donny)
November 18, 2019 Filing 123 MOTION to Subpoena Medical Records/Bills from Hospital Galveston/UTMB (Motions referred to Dena Hanovice Palermo) by Brickey Juan Manuel, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/9/2019. (sanderson, 4)
November 15, 2019 Filing 119 STIPULATION re: Jurisdictional Discovery by Mitsui & Co (U S A) Inc, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Regarding Jurisdictional Discovery)(Thompson, James)
November 14, 2019 Filing 120 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Brickey Juan Manuel re: #109 Order to Consolidate Cases, filed. (ShoshanaArnow, 4)
November 13, 2019 Filing 121 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Brickey Juan Manuel re: Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,, filed. (ShoshanaArnow, 4)
November 13, 2019 Filing 118 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Bradley O'Neill, Benjamin Roberts, and Wisam Ghuneim on behalf of Rogelio Lopez Munoz, filed. (O'Neill, Richard)
November 13, 2019 Filing 117 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Brickey Juan Manuel re: Letter/request of docket sheet, filed. (dbenavides, 1)
November 5, 2019 Filing 116 NOTICE of Motion Agreed to Consolidate/Class Action to Lead Case No. 4:19cv1460 by Brickey Juan Manuel, filed. (LoriPurifoy, 4)
November 5, 2019 Filing 115 ANSWER to Complaint by Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC, filed.(Lewis, Russell)
November 4, 2019 Filing 114 Letter from Brickey Juan Manuel re: status of case, filed. Copy of current docket sheet mailed to consol pltff Manuel. (LoriPurifoy, 4)
November 4, 2019 Filing 113 Letter from Brickey Juan Manuel re: Requesting Docket Sheet, filed. [Copy of docket sheet mailed to requester] (SarahShelby, 4)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo. It is ORDERED that the above-captioned matter shall be referred to United States Magistrate Judge Dena Palermo to conduct all further proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(a), specifically to manage discovery, pretrial and dispositive motions. The parties are admonished that the Court will not entertain motions to dismiss. After discovery, motions for summary judgment will be entertained.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
November 1, 2019 Filing 111 NOTICE of Change of Address by Brickey Juan Manuel, filed. (dnoriega, 1)
November 1, 2019 Filing 110 Supplement to Plaintiff's Original Complaint RE: Damages / Relief by Brickey Juan Manuel, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/22/2019. (dnoriega, 1) Modified on 1/14/2020 (cfelchak, 4).
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE CASES: Lead Case No. 4:19-cv-1460 and Member Case No. 4:19-cv-3457, 4:19-cv-3594, 4:19-cv-3609 and 4:19-cv-4051; granting #107 MOTION to Consolidate. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
October 30, 2019 Filing 108 RESPONSE in Opposition to #107 MOTION to Consolidate Lead Case No. 4:19-cv-01460 and Member Case No. 4:19-cv-02674, 4:19-cv-03594, 4:19-cv-03609, 4:19-cv-04051, filed by Kolmar Americas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Garcia, Juan)
October 25, 2019 Filing 107 MOTION to Consolidate Lead Case No. 4:19-cv-01460 and Member Case No. 4:19-cv-02674, 4:19-cv-03594, 4:19-cv-03609, 4:19-cv-04051 by Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lewis, Russell)
October 16, 2019 Filing 106 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Persons Most Knowledgeable by Amanda Bryant, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Underwood, Mark)
October 14, 2019 Filing 105 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC/Kelly Hanen for Transcript of Status Conference on 09/26/19 before Judge Hoyt. Ordinary (30 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Fred Warner, filed. (Hanen, Kelly)
October 10, 2019 Filing 104 ANSWER to Complaint by Mitsui & Co (U S A) Inc, filed.(Thompson, James)
October 10, 2019 Filing 103 ANSWER to Complaint by Mitsui & Co (U S A) Inc, filed.(Thompson, James)
October 10, 2019 Filing 102 ANSWER to Complaint by Mitsui & Co (U S A) Inc, filed.(Thompson, James)
October 10, 2019 Filing 101 ANSWER to Complaint by Mitsui & Co (U S A) Inc, filed.(Thompson, James)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting #57 Bryant Plaintiffs' Motion to Appoint Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
October 8, 2019 Filing 98 Letter to Judge Hoyt regarding Plaintiffs' fact sheets by Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Individual Claimant Fact Sheet, #2 Exhibit - Business Claimant Fact Sheet)(Lewis, Russell)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Regarding #84 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Second MOTION Amended for Approval of Leadership Structure. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
September 27, 2019 Filing 97 PROPOSED ORDER re: #71 Reply in Support of Motion,, filed.(Liuzza, Ashley)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER denying #69 Defendant Intercontinental Terminals Management Company's Motion to Dismiss.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER denying #41 , #47 Defendant Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc.'s Motions to Dismiss.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
September 26, 2019 Filing 94 RESPONSE in Opposition to #56 MOTION to Stay Discovery in Case Nos. 4:19-cv-1708; 4:19-cv-2425; 4:19-cv-2674; 4:19-cv-2775, filed by Abel Arguelles, John Badera. (Post, Russell)
September 26, 2019 Filing 93 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 9/26/2019. Arguments heard. The Court takes the parties' Motions for Approval of Leadership Structure under advisement. Status Conference set for 1/17/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt. Appearances:Michael Essmyer, Jr., Van Bunch (by phone), Spencer Speed, Charles Rene Houssiere, III, Randal Alan Kauffman, Ashley M. Liuzza, Shawn Paul Fox, Sean Patrick Tracey, Donny J Foty, Donald Clinton Green, II, Benjamin Russell Roberts, Lance Nolan Walters, John Carl Duff, Dennis D Spurling, Bernardino Agosto, Jr, Michael S Goldberg, Benjamin Eric Gonsoulin, Kelly Elizabeth Hanen, Ivan M Rodriguez, Russell Carter Lewis, Frederic Daniel Knight, Matthew Charles Hoffman, Phillip B Dye, Jr, Chance Allen McMillan, Phillip L Sampson, Jr, Shannon Elyse Glen, Carlton Dalbey Wilde, III, Christopher Lee Dodson.(Court Reporter: F. Warner), filed.(chorace)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand In Case No. 4:19-cv-02425. The motion is denied. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand in Case No. 4:19-cv-02429 #8 . (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace) Modified on 1/16/2020 (cfelchak, 4).
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting #56 Defendant Mitsui & Co. Motion to Stay Discovery. All discovery shall be conducted in the lead case, unless specifically directed by the Court.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
September 25, 2019 Filing 89 NOTICE Letter to Court by Jeffrey Aaron, Amanda Bryant, Veronica Cantu, Harn Lee, Nancy Nguyen, Stephanie Ochoa, Michael Walker, filed. (Liuzza, Ashley)
September 25, 2019 Filing 88 CERTIFICATE of Conference re: #84 Unopposed MOTION for Approval of Leadership Structure by Destrea Armstrong, filed.(Green, Donald)
September 25, 2019 Filing 87 NOTICE Letter to Court by Mitsui & Co (U S A) Inc, filed. (Dye, Phillip)
September 25, 2019 Filing 86 REPLY in Support of #56 MOTION to Stay Discovery in Case Nos. 4:19-cv-1708; 4:19-cv-2425; 4:19-cv-2674; 4:19-cv-2775, filed by Mitsui & Co (U S A) Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Affidavit Declaration of Matthew Hoffman)(Thompson, James)
September 25, 2019 Filing 85 Letter to Case Manager regarding Plaintiffs Second Amended Motion for Approval of Leadership Structure (Dkt. 84) by Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC, filed.(Goldberg, Michael)
September 24, 2019 Filing 84 Unopposed MOTION for Approval of Leadership Structure by Destrea Armstrong, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hodges, David)
September 24, 2019 Filing 83 RESPONSE in Opposition to #69 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6), filed by Abel Arguelles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(McGovern, Owen)
September 18, 2019 Filing 82 RESPONSE to #56 MOTION to Stay Discovery in Case Nos. 4:19-cv-1708; 4:19-cv-2425; 4:19-cv-2674; 4:19-cv-2775 filed by Cassandra Shepard. (Kauffman, Randal)
September 18, 2019 Filing 81 RESPONSE in Opposition to #56 MOTION to Stay Discovery in Case Nos. 4:19-cv-1708; 4:19-cv-2425; 4:19-cv-2674; 4:19-cv-2775, filed by Amanda Bryant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Underwood, Mark)
September 13, 2019 Filing 80 Letter to Case Manager regarding Plaintiffs' fact sheets by Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC, filed.(Lewis, Russell)
September 13, 2019 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald C. Green, II on behalf of Destrea Armstrong, filed. (Green, Donald)
September 10, 2019 Filing 78 REPLY in Support of #47 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, filed by Mitsui & Co (U S A) Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Affidavit Declaration of Matt Hoffman)(Thompson, James)
September 10, 2019 Filing 77 REPLY in Support of #7 Opposed MOTION to Remand, filed by Abel Arguelles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(McGovern, Owen)
September 6, 2019 Filing 76 REPLY in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, filed by Mitsui & Co (U S A) Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Matthew Hoffman, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L)(Thompson, James)
September 6, 2019 Filing 75 REPLY In Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, filed by Mitsui & Co (U S A) Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Matthew Hoffman, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L)(Thompson, James)
September 6, 2019 Filing 74 Letter to Case Manager regarding Plaintiffs' fact sheets by Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC, filed.(Lewis, Russell)
September 6, 2019 Filing 73 NOTICE of Service of Plaintiffs' First Amended Initial Disclosures by Abel Arguelles, John Badera, Rhena Hernandez, filed. (Fox, Shawn)
September 6, 2019 Filing 72 PROPOSED ORDER Granting Bryant Plaintiffs Memo in Support of Motion to Appoint re: #71 Reply in Support of Motion,, filed.(Underwood, Mark)
September 6, 2019 Filing 71 REPLY in Support of #57 Unopposed MOTION for Approval of Leadership Structure, #61 Amended MOTION for Approval of Leadership Structure, filed by Amanda Bryant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Underwood, Mark)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Stipulation and Protective Order(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4)
September 3, 2019 Filing 69 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) by Intercontinental Terminals Management Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Knight, Frederic)
September 3, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses by Amanda Bryant, filed. (Underwood, Mark)
September 3, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses by Refugio Reyes, filed. (McMillan, Chance)
September 3, 2019 Filing 66 RESPONSE to #47 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Cassandra Shepard. (Kauffman, Randal)
September 3, 2019 Filing 65 Agreed INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Cassandra Shepard, filed.(Kauffman, Randal)
September 3, 2019 Filing 64 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand in Case No. 4:19-cv-02674, filed by Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix - Index to Unpublished Cases, #2 Appendix - Tab A, #3 Appendix - Tab B, #4 Appendix - Tab C, #5 Appendix - Tab D, #6 Proposed Order)(Lewis, Russell)
September 3, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses by Abel Arguelles, John Badera, Rhena Hernandez, filed. (Fox, Shawn)
September 3, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses by Lorena DiBello, filed. (Agosto, Bernardino)
September 3, 2019 Filing 61 Amended MOTION for Approval of Leadership Structure by Rogelio Lopez Munoz, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hodges, David)
August 30, 2019 Filing 60 RESPONSE Opposing Motion to Dismiss, filed by John Badera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(McGovern, Owen)
August 30, 2019 Filing 59 RESPONSE Opposing Motion to Dismiss, filed by Abel Arguelles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(McGovern, Owen)
August 30, 2019 Filing 58 REPLY in Support of #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, filed by Mitsui & Co (U S A) Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Thompson, James)
August 30, 2019 Filing 57 Unopposed MOTION for Approval of Leadership Structure by Rogelio Lopez Munoz, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hodges, David)
August 28, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION to Stay Discovery in Case Nos. 4:19-cv-1708; 4:19-cv-2425; 4:19-cv-2674; 4:19-cv-2775 by Mitsui & Co (U S A) Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order Order of Stay)(Thompson, James)
August 23, 2019 Filing 55 RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand in Case No. 4:19-cv-02425, filed by Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix - Index to Unpublished Cases, #2 Appendix - Tab A, #3 Appendix - Tab B, #4 Appendix - Tab C, #5 Appendix - Tab D, #6 Appendix - Tab E, #7 Appendix - Tab F, #8 Appendix - Tab G, #9 Appendix - Tab H, #10 Appendix - Tab I, #11 Appendix - Tab J, #12 Appendix - Tab K, #13 Appendix - Tab L, #14 Appendix - Tab M, #15 Appendix - Tab N, #16 Proposed Order)(Lewis, Russell)
August 23, 2019 Filing 54 RESPONSE in Opposition to #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, filed by Amanda Bryant. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Mark Underwood, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D to Declaration, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E to Declaration, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F to Declaration, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G to Declaration, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H to Declaration)(Underwood, Mark)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #48 Motion to Consolidate Cases: Lead Case No. 4:19-cv-1460 and Member Case Nos. 4:19-cv-2674, 4:19-cv-2775.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4)
August 19, 2019 Filing 52 PROPOSED ORDER - Stipulation and Protective Order re: #46 Memorandum and Order,,,, filed.(Lewis, Russell)
August 13, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip B. Dye, Jr. on behalf of Mitsui & Co (U S A) Inc, filed. (Dye, Phillip)
August 13, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by D. Ferguson McNiel, III on behalf of Mitsui & Co (U S A) Inc, filed. (McNiel, D)
August 13, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew C. Hoffman on behalf of Mitsui & Co (U S A) Inc, filed. (Hoffman, Matthew)
August 13, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION to Consolidate Lead Case No. 4:19-cv-1460 and Member Case No. 4:19-cv-2674; 4:19-cv-2775 by Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lewis, Russell)
August 12, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Mitsui & Co (U S A) Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Yoichi Shirata, #2 Affidavit Mark Jeansonne, #3 Proposed Order)(Thompson, James)
August 12, 2019 Filing 45 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #44 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (dhansen, 4)
August 10, 2019 Filing 44 TRANSCRIPT re: Initial Conference held on 7-29-19 before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt. Court Reporter/Transcriber B. Slavin. Ordering Party Defendant ITC, LLC Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/8/2019., filed. (bslavin, )
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Initial Disclosures and Commencement of Third-Party Fact Discovery due by 9/3/2019; Joinder of Parties and Amend Pleadings due by 12/20/2019; Joint Status Report due by 1/10/2020; Deadline for Defendants to Submit Draft Fact Sheets for Personal Injury and Property Damage Claims due by 8/19/2019; Deadline for Parties to Agree on Fact Sheets or, alternatively, Request Status Conference regarding Fact Sheets due by 9/6/2019; Deadline for Plaintiffs to Produce Fact Sheets and Supporting Documentation for Current Plaintiffs due by 12/6/2019; Status Conference deadline 1/17/2020; Discovery on Class Certification shall commence on or after 12/20/2019; Status Conference set for 9/26/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt. Additional rulings as indicated in this Order.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
August 9, 2019 Filing 43 RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand in Case No. 4:19-cv-02429, filed by Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix - Index to Unpublished Cases, #2 Appendix - Tab A, #3 Appendix - Tab B, #4 Appendix - Tab C, #5 Appendix - Tab D, #6 Appendix - Tab E, #7 Appendix - Tab F, #8 Proposed Order)(Gonsoulin, Benjamin)
August 5, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Chance A. McMillan on behalf of Refugio Reyes, filed. (McMillan, Chance)
August 2, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Mitsui & Co (U S A) Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Thompson, James)
August 2, 2019 Filing 40 ANSWER to Complaint by Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC, filed.(Lewis, Russell)
August 1, 2019 Filing 39 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC/Kelly Hanen for Transcript of Initial Conference, July 29, 2019, Judge Hoyt. Ordinary (30 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Bruce Slavin, filed. (Hanen, Kelly)
July 29, 2019 Filing 38 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 7/29/2019. The Court heard argument concerning the initial discovery phase in this matter. Order to follow. Appearances:Phillip Dye, David Wayne Hodges, Charles Rene Houssiere, III, Benjamin Russell Roberts, Husein Hadimohammadabadi, Robert C Hilliard, Mark Forest Underwood, Dennis D Spurling, Bernardino Agosto, Jr, Shawn Paul Fox, Michael S Goldberg, Kelly Elizabeth Hanen, Russell Carter Lewis, William Rey Ogden, Christopher Lee Dodson, Phillip L Sampson, Jr. Additional appearances noted in the record/transcript.(Court Reporter: B. Slavin), filed.(chorace)
July 26, 2019 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Mitsui & Co (U S A) Inc, filed.(Thompson, James)
July 26, 2019 Filing 36 Amended CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC, Alice Richardson, filed.(Lewis, Russell)
July 26, 2019 Filing 35 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC, filed.(Lewis, Russell)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #31 Motion to Consolidate Cases: Lead Case No. 4:19-cv-01460 and Member Case No. 4:19-cv-02419; 4:19-cv-02429.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE CASES: Lead Case No. 4:19cv01460 and Member Case No. 4:19cv02425 (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4)
July 19, 2019 Filing 32 RESPONSE to #25 Opposed MOTION to Consolidate Lead Case No. 4:19-cv-01460 and Member Case No. 4:19-cv-01882; 4:19-cv-01887; 4:19-cv-01890; 4:19-cv-01886 filed by Amanda Bryant. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Underwood, Mark)
July 18, 2019 Filing 31 Opposed MOTION to Consolidate Lead Case No. 4:19-cv-01460 and Member Case No. 4:19-cv-02419; 4:19-cv-02425; 4:19-cv-02429 by Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lewis, Russell)
July 11, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference set for 7/29/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11A before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt, filed. (chorace)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #25 Motion to Consolidate Cases: Lead Case No. 4:19-cv-01460 and Member Case No. 4:19-cv-01882, 4:19-cv-01887, 4:19-cv-01890, 4:19-cv-01886.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4)
July 11, 2019 Filing 28 Letter to Court Case Manager Requesting Expedited Setting of Rule 26 Conference by G M B, a Minor, James Bingham, Marissa Bingham, Justin Braly, Fabiola Bueno, Leo Bueno, A C, a Minor, T C, a Minor, Breccia Carmona, Gary Chiarlone, Charles Wayne Collins, Deborah Cron, A D, a Minor, E D, a Minor, J D, a Minor, Julio DeLeon, A G, a Minor, D G, a Minor, I G, a Minor, S G, a Minor, Deborah Gamel, Isaac Garza, Sandra Gonzales, Angel Guzman, M H, II, a Minor, M H, III, a Minor, A H, a Minor, J H, a Minor, L H, a Minor, Deanna Harper-Conley, Benilde Hernandez, Daniel Hernandez, Renee Hernandez, Felix Herrera, M H I, a Minor, D'Andre Jackson, II, Asadulla Khan, Gary Landery, E M, a Minor, Julie Muniz, Rogelio Lopez Munoz, John Novelli, Chastity Parino, Violet Perales, Matias Reinhardt, Sandra Reyes, J S, a Minor, Consuelo Garcia Saenz, Marissa Salinas, Abelardo Sanchez, Lizette Velez, Daisy Villanueva, Janet Villanueva, Felicia Williams, filed.(Roberts, Benjamin)
July 8, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE to #4 MOTION to Consolidate Lead Case No. 4:19-cv-01460 and Member Case No. 4:19-cv-01447, 4:19-cv-01428, 4:19-cv-01424, 4:19-cv-01433, 4:19-cv-01434, 4:19-cv-01440, 4:19-cv-01444, 4:19-cv-01430, 4:19-cv-01431, 4:19-cv-01450, 4:19-cv-01459, 4:19-cv-01461, 4 filed by Vopak Terminal Deer Park Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Sampson, Phillip)
July 2, 2019 Filing 26 STIPULATION re: Time to Answer, Plead, or Otherwise Respond in Case No. 4:19-cv-01708 by Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lewis, Russell)
June 28, 2019 Filing 25 Opposed MOTION to Consolidate Lead Case No. 4:19-cv-01460 and Member Case No. 4:19-cv-01882; 4:19-cv-01887; 4:19-cv-01890; 4:19-cv-01886 by Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lewis, Russell)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice in Case No. 4:19-CV-01433.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying Plaintiff's Motion to Remand in Case No. 4:19-CV-01428. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying #7 Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand in Lead Case No. 4:19-CV-01460.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying #6 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
June 18, 2019 Filing 20 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Amanda Bryant served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/5/2019, filed.(Underwood, Mark)
June 18, 2019 Filing 19 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Amanda Bryant served on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/5/2019, filed.(Underwood, Mark)
June 12, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' Motion for Voluntary Dismissal, Without Prejudice in Case No. 4:19-CV-01433, filed by Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix - Index to Unpublished Cases, #2 Appendix - Tab A, #3 Appendix - Tab B, #4 Appendix - Tab C, #5 Appendix - Tab D, #6 Appendix - Tab E, #7 Appendix - Tab F, #8 Appendix - Tab G, #9 Appendix - Tab H, #10 Proposed Order)(Lewis, Russell)
June 10, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand in Case No. 4:19-cv-01428, filed by Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix - Index to Unpublished Cases, #2 Appendix - Tab A, #3 Appendix - Tab B, #4 Appendix - Tab C, #5 Appendix - Tab D, #6 Appendix - Tab E, #7 Appendix - Tab F, #8 Proposed Order)(Lewis, Russell)
June 10, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #7 Opposed MOTION to Remand filed by Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix - Index to Unpublished Cases, #2 Appendix - Tab A, #3 Appendix - Tab B, #4 Appendix - Tab C, #5 Appendix - Tab D, #6 Appendix - Tab E, #7 Appendix - Tab F, #8 Appendix - Tab G, #9 Appendix - Tab H, #10 Appendix - Tab I, #11 Proposed Order)(Lewis, Russell)
June 5, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand in Case No. 4:19-CV-01447, filed by Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix - Index to Unpublished Cases, #2 Appendix - Tab A, #3 Appendix - Tab B, #4 Appendix - Tab C, #5 Appendix - Tab D, #6 Appendix - Tab E, #7 Appendix - Tab F, #8 Appendix - Tab G, #9 Appendix - Tab H, #10 Proposed Order)(Lewis, Russell)
June 4, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to #6 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, filed by G M B, a Minor, James Bingham, Marissa Bingham, Justin Braly, Fabiola Bueno, Leo Bueno, A C, a Minor, T C, a Minor, Breccia Carmona, Gary Chiarlone, Charles Wayne Collins, Deborah Cron, A D, a Minor, E D, a Minor, J D, a Minor, Julio DeLeon, A G, a Minor, D G, a Minor, I G, a Minor, S G, a Minor, Deborah Gamel, Isaac Garza, Sandra Gonzales, Angel Guzman, M H, II, a Minor, M H, III, a Minor, A H, a Minor, J H, a Minor, L H, a Minor, Deanna Harper-Conley, Benilde Hernandez, Daniel Hernandez, Renee Hernandez, Felix Herrera, M H I, a Minor, D'Andre Jackson, II, Asadulla Khan, Gary Landery, E M, a Minor, Julie Muniz, John Novelli, Chastity Parino, Violet Perales, Matias Reinhardt, Sandra Reyes, J S, a Minor, Consuelo Garcia Saenz, Marissa Salinas, Abelardo Sanchez, Lizette Velez, Daisy Villanueva, Janet Villanueva, Felicia Williams. (Roberts, Benjamin)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE CASES: Lead Case No. 4:19-cv-01460 and Member Case No. 4:19-cv-01708 (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4)
June 3, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' Motions for Voluntary Dismissal, Without Prejudice, in Case Nos. 4:19-cv-01430; 4:19-cv-01431; 4:19-cv-01434; 4:19-cv-01436; 4:19-cv-01440; 4:19-cv-01443; 4:19-cv-01444; 4:19-cv-01450; 4:19-cv-01452; 4:19-cv-01457; 4:19-cv-01459; and 4:19-cv-01461, filed by Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix - Index to Unpublished Cases, #2 Appendix - Tab A, #3 Appendix - Tab B, #4 Appendix - Tab C, #5 Appendix - Tab D, #6 Appendix - Tab E, #7 Appendix - Tab F, #8 Appendix - Tab G, #9 Proposed Order)(Lewis, Russell)
May 31, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #6 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Stephen Warren Miles, #2 Appendix - Index to Unpublished Cases, #3 Appendix - Tab A, #4 Appendix - Tab B, #5 Appendix - Tab C, #6 Appendix - Tab D, #7 Appendix - Tab E, #8 Appendix - Tab F, #9 Appendix - Tab G, #10 Appendix - Tab H, #11 Appendix - Tab I, #12 Proposed Order)(Lewis, Russell)
May 29, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition to #2 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice, filed by Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC. (Lewis, Russell)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Consolidate Cases: Lead Case No. 19-cv-1460 and Member Case No. 4:19-cv-1424, 4:19-cv-1428, 4:19-cv-1430, 4:19-cv-1431, 4:19-cv-1433, 4:19-cv-1434, 4:19-cv-1436, 4:19-cv-1440, 4:19-cv-1443, 4:19-cv-1444, 4:19-cv-1447, 4:19-cv-1450, 4:19-cv-1452, 4:19-cv-1453, 4:19-cv-1457, 4:19-cv-1459, 4:19-cv-1461.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Expedited Response re: #6 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. Response to Motion due by 6/3/2019.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 Opposed MOTION to Remand by G M B, a Minor, James Bingham, Marissa Bingham, Justin Braly, Fabiola Bueno, Leo Bueno, A C, a Minor, T C, a Minor, Breccia Carmona, Gary Chiarlone, Charles Wayne Collins, Deborah Cron, A D, a Minor, E D, a Minor, J D, a Minor, Julio DeLeon, A G, a Minor, D G, a Minor, I G, a Minor, S G, a Minor, Deborah Gamel, Isaac Garza, Sandra Gonzales, Angel Guzman, M H, II, a Minor, M H, III, a Minor, A H, a Minor, J H, a Minor, L H, a Minor, Deanna Harper-Conley, Benilde Hernandez, Daniel Hernandez, Renee Hernandez, Felix Herrera, M H I, a Minor, D'Andre Jackson, II, Asadulla Khan, Gary Landery, E M, a Minor, Julie Muniz, Rogelio Lopez Munoz, John Novelli, Chastity Parino, Violet Perales, Matias Reinhardt, Sandra Reyes, J S, a Minor, Consuelo Garcia Saenz, Marissa Salinas, Abelardo Sanchez, Lizette Velez, Daisy Villanueva, Janet Villanueva, Felicia Williams, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Roberts, Benjamin)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by G M B, a Minor, James Bingham, Marissa Bingham, Justin Braly, Fabiola Bueno, Leo Bueno, A C, a Minor, T C, a Minor, Breccia Carmona, Gary Chiarlone, Charles Wayne Collins, Deborah Cron, A D, a Minor, E D, a Minor, J D, a Minor, Julio DeLeon, A G, a Minor, D G, a Minor, I G, a Minor, S G, a Minor, Deborah Gamel, Isaac Garza, Sandra Gonzales, Angel Guzman, M H, II, a Minor, M H, III, a Minor, A H, a Minor, J H, a Minor, L H, a Minor, Deanna Harper-Conley, Benilde Hernandez, Daniel Hernandez, Renee Hernandez, Felix Herrera, M H I, a Minor, D'Andre Jackson, II, Asadulla Khan, Gary Landery, E M, a Minor, Julie Muniz, Rogelio Lopez Munoz, John Novelli, Chastity Parino, Violet Perales, Matias Reinhardt, Sandra Reyes, J S, a Minor, Consuelo Garcia Saenz, Marissa Salinas, Abelardo Sanchez, Lizette Velez, Daisy Villanueva, Janet Villanueva, Felicia Williams, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order Order on Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave)(Roberts, Benjamin)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 Letter to Court Case Manager concerning Plaintiffs' Motion for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by G M B, a Minor, James Bingham, Marissa Bingham, Justin Braly, Fabiola Bueno, Leo Bueno, A C, a Minor, T C, a Minor, Breccia Carmona, Gary Chiarlone, Charles Wayne Collins, Deborah Cron, A D, a Minor, E D, a Minor, J D, a Minor, Julio DeLeon, A G, a Minor, D G, a Minor, I G, a Minor, S G, a Minor, Deborah Gamel, Isaac Garza, Sandra Gonzales, Angel Guzman, M H, II, a Minor, M H, III, a Minor, A H, a Minor, J H, a Minor, L H, a Minor, Deanna Harper-Conley, Benilde Hernandez, Daniel Hernandez, Renee Hernandez, Felix Herrera, M H I, a Minor, D'Andre Jackson, II, Asadulla Khan, Gary Landery, E M, a Minor, Julie Muniz, Rogelio Lopez Munoz, John Novelli, Chastity Parino, Violet Perales, Matias Reinhardt, Sandra Reyes, J S, a Minor, Consuelo Garcia Saenz, Marissa Salinas, Abelardo Sanchez, Lizette Velez, Daisy Villanueva, Janet Villanueva, Felicia Williams, filed.(Roberts, Benjamin)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Consolidate Lead Case No. 4:19-cv-01460 and Member Case No. 4:19-cv-01447, 4:19-cv-01428, 4:19-cv-01424, 4:19-cv-01433, 4:19-cv-01434, 4:19-cv-01440, 4:19-cv-01444, 4:19-cv-01430, 4:19-cv-01431, 4:19-cv-01450, 4:19-cv-01459, 4:19-cv-01461, 4:19-cv-01453, 4:19-cv-01436, 4:19-cv-01443, 4:19-cv-01452, 4:19-cv-01457 by Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lewis, Russell)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to Case Manager regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for Voluntary Dismissal, Without Prejudice by Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC, filed.(Lewis, Russell)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice by G M B, a Minor, James Bingham, Marissa Bingham, Justin Braly, Fabiola Bueno, Leo Bueno, A C, a Minor, T C, a Minor, Breccia Carmona, Gary Chiarlone, Charles Wayne Collins, Deborah Cron, A D, a Minor, E D, a Minor, J D, a Minor, Julio DeLeon, A G, a Minor, D G, a Minor, I G, a Minor, S G, a Minor, Deborah Gamel, Isaac Garza, Sandra Gonzales, Angel Guzman, M H, II, a Minor, M H, III, a Minor, A H, a Minor, J H, a Minor, L H, a Minor, Deanna Harper-Conley, Benilde Hernandez, Daniel Hernandez, Renee Hernandez, Felix Herrera, M H I, a Minor, D'Andre Jackson, II, Asadulla Khan, Gary Landery, E M, a Minor, Julie Muniz, Rogelio Lopez Munoz, John Novelli, Chastity Parino, Violet Perales, Matias Reinhardt, Sandra Reyes, J S, a Minor, Consuelo Garcia Saenz, Marissa Salinas, Abelardo Sanchez, Lizette Velez, Daisy Villanueva, Janet Villanueva, Felicia Williams, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Roberts, Benjamin)
April 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 11th Judicial District Court, case number 2019-20985 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22279370) filed by Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Lewis, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Munoz et al v. Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Reyes
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A C, a Minor
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M H, III, a Minor
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E M, a Minor
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Muniz
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix Herrera
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Villanueva
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marissa Bingham
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daisy Villanueva
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marissa Salinas
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J S, a Minor
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lizette Velez
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Wayne Collins
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Landery
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Cron
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanna Harper-Conley
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Williams
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abelardo Sanchez
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fabiola Bueno
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I G, a Minor
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G M B, a Minor
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Novelli
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chastity Parino
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Braly
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E D, a Minor
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matias Reinhardt
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leo Bueno
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Guzman
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Gamel
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benilde Hernandez
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Chiarlone
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A H, a Minor
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J H, a Minor
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A D, a Minor
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Represented By: Randal Alan Kauffman
Represented By: Charles Rene Houssiere, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J D, a Minor
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D'Andre Jackson, II
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L H, a Minor
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Consuelo Garcia Saenz
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaac Garza
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Hernandez
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D G, a Minor
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Bingham
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M H, II, a Minor
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M H I, a Minor
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rogelio Lopez Munoz
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Gonzales
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Hernandez
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asadulla Khan
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Breccia Carmona
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Violet Perales
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S G, a Minor
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A G, a Minor
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T C, a Minor
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio DeLeon
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vopak Terminal Deer Park Inc.
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Shannon Elyse Glen
Represented By: Carlton Dalbey Wilde, III
Represented By: Christopher Lee Dodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Aaron
Represented By: Ashley M. Liuzza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Cantu
Represented By: Ashley M. Liuzza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC
Represented By: Russell Carter Lewis
Represented By: Michael S Goldberg
Represented By: Benjamin Eric Gonsoulin
Represented By: Kelly Elizabeth Hanen
Represented By: Michael Edward Streich
Represented By: Marcus Grant Matthews
Represented By: Ivan M Rodriguez
Represented By: Elizabeth Pennington Furlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Refugio Reyes
Represented By: William Rey Ogden
Represented By: Chance Allen McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Stephanie Ochoa
Represented By: P Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Michael G Stag
Represented By: Ashley M. Liuzza
Represented By: Mark Forest Underwood
Represented By: Matthew D Rogenes
Represented By: Dennis D Spurling
Represented By: Van Branch
Represented By: David R Barney, Jr
Represented By: Van Bunch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Danny Smith
Represented By: Husein Hadimohammadabadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Matthew Roberts
Represented By: Husein Hadimohammadabadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Rose Mary Mottu
Represented By: Bernardino Agosto, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Swim Houston Pool Management L L C
Represented By: P Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Michael G Stag
Represented By: Ashley M. Liuzza
Represented By: Mark Forest Underwood
Represented By: Matthew D Rogenes
Represented By: Dennis D Spurling
Represented By: Van Branch
Represented By: David R Barney, Jr
Represented By: Van Bunch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Harn Lee
Represented By: P Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Michael G Stag
Represented By: Ashley M. Liuzza
Represented By: Mark Forest Underwood
Represented By: Matthew D Rogenes
Represented By: Dennis D Spurling
Represented By: Van Branch
Represented By: David R Barney, Jr
Represented By: Van Bunch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Tyana Bailey
Represented By: Husein Hadimohammadabadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Lydia Urbina
Represented By: Husein Hadimohammadabadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Mary Ann Bridge
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: John Carl Duff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Norma Mottu
Represented By: Bernardino Agosto, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Gwendolyn Tennard
Represented By: Husein Hadimohammadabadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Lisa Linsicombe
Represented By: Husein Hadimohammadabadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: John M Garza, Jr.
Represented By: Bernardino Agosto, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Amanda Morales
Represented By: Bernardino Agosto, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Teresa Daigle
Represented By: Husein Hadimohammadabadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Oletha Brown
Represented By: Husein Hadimohammadabadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Nancy Nguyen
Represented By: P Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Michael G Stag
Represented By: Ashley M. Liuzza
Represented By: Mark Forest Underwood
Represented By: Matthew D Rogenes
Represented By: Dennis D Spurling
Represented By: Van Branch
Represented By: David R Barney, Jr
Represented By: Van Bunch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Yehya Yaman
Represented By: Husein Hadimohammadabadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Amanda Bryant
Represented By: P Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Michael G Stag
Represented By: Ashley M. Liuzza
Represented By: Mark Forest Underwood
Represented By: Matthew D Rogenes
Represented By: Dennis D Spurling
Represented By: Van Branch
Represented By: David R Barney, Jr
Represented By: Van Bunch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Destrea Armstrong
Represented By: David Wayne Hodges
Represented By: Donny J Foty
Represented By: Donald Clinton Green, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Charles Watts, Jr.
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: John Carl Duff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Brian Wayne
Represented By: Husein Hadimohammadabadi
Represented By: Carnegie Harvard Mims, III
Represented By: Sedrick Stagg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Adal Salaam
Represented By: Husein Hadimohammadabadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Michael Walker
Represented By: P Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Michael G Stag
Represented By: Ashley M. Liuzza
Represented By: Mark Forest Underwood
Represented By: Matthew D Rogenes
Represented By: Dennis D Spurling
Represented By: David R Barney, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Nelda Bates
Represented By: Husein Hadimohammadabadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Pablo Mendez
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: John Carl Duff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Veronica Coleman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: John Carl Duff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Ruben Olmos
Represented By: Husein Hadimohammadabadi
Represented By: Carnegie Harvard Mims, III
Represented By: Sedrick Stagg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: John M Garza, III
Represented By: Bernardino Agosto, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Justin Connor
Represented By: Randal Alan Kauffman
Represented By: Charles Rene Houssiere, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: John Badera
Represented By: Lance Nolan Walters
Represented By: Scott C Greenlee
Represented By: Shawn Paul Fox
Represented By: Sean Patrick Tracey
Represented By: Russell Stanley Post
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Kerschen D. Woolridge
Represented By: Mark A Weycer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Pedro Perez Fernandez
Represented By: Randal Alan Kauffman
Represented By: Charles Rene Houssiere, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Lynn Maughmer
Represented By: Randal Alan Kauffman
Represented By: Charles Rene Houssiere, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Rhena Hernandez
Represented By: Sean Patrick Tracey
Represented By: Scott C Greenlee
Represented By: Shawn Paul Fox
Represented By: Owen J. McGovern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: R. N., a Minor
Represented By: Michael M Essmyer, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Cassandra Shepard
Represented By: Randal Alan Kauffman
Represented By: Charles Rene Houssiere, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: First Coast Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: John M Moon, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Victoria Salas
Represented By: Randal Alan Kauffman
Represented By: Charles Rene Houssiere, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Shantea Nelson
Represented By: Michael M Essmyer, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Lorena DiBello
Represented By: Bernardino Agosto, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: G.D.
Represented By: Randal Alan Kauffman
Represented By: Charles Rene Houssiere, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Bradley Baxter
Represented By: Randal Alan Kauffman
Represented By: Charles Rene Houssiere, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: A.D.
Represented By: Charles Rene Houssiere, III
Represented By: Randal Alan Kauffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Robert Steckler
Represented By: Randal Alan Kauffman
Represented By: Charles Rene Houssiere, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Raymond Nelson
Represented By: Michael M Essmyer, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Rosmer Villalobos Diaz
Represented By: Randal Alan Kauffman
Represented By: Charles Rene Houssiere, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Yesenia Diaz
Represented By: Randal Alan Kauffman
Represented By: Charles Rene Houssiere, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Monique Woolridge
Represented By: Mark A Weycer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: C.D.
Represented By: Randal Alan Kauffman
Represented By: Charles Rene Houssiere, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Abel Arguelles
Represented By: Owen J. McGovern
Represented By: Russell Stanley Post
Represented By: Shawn Paul Fox
Represented By: Sean Patrick Tracey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Bradford Atchison
Represented By: Randal Alan Kauffman
Represented By: Charles Rene Houssiere, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Luciano Adame
Represented By: Matthew R Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Estuardo Alecio
Represented By: Matthew R Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jeremiah Aguilar
Represented By: Matthew R Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Kolmar Americas, Inc.,
Represented By: Leslie A. Davis
Represented By: John N. Thomas
Represented By: Juan Carlos Garcia, Sr
Represented By: Mary S. DiRago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: David Adair
Represented By: Matthew R Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Brickey Juan Manuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: G D
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: C D
Represented By: Charles Rene Houssiere, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Meshal Alexander
Represented By: Matthew R Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Juan Acevedo
Represented By: Matthew R Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Alexis Alexander
Represented By: Matthew R Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Gregory Alexander
Represented By: Matthew R Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Archie Advinicula
Represented By: Matthew R Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Melquisha Adams
Represented By: Matthew R Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Ramiro Aguirre
Represented By: Matthew R Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Coal City Cob Company, Inc.
Represented By: James P Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Mitsui & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Alice Richardson
Represented By: Michael S Goldberg
Represented By: Russell Carter Lewis
Represented By: Benjamin Eric Gonsoulin
Represented By: Kelly Elizabeth Hanen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Mitsui & Co (U S A) Inc
Represented By: Phillip B Dye, Jr
Represented By: D Ferguson McNiel
Represented By: James Daniel Thompson, III
Represented By: Matthew Charles Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Intercontinental Terminals Management Company
Represented By: Frederic Daniel Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Bernt A. Netland
Represented By: Benjamin Eric Gonsoulin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?