Aswegan v. Diesel et al
Plaintiff: Sara Aswegan
Defendant: John H. Diesel and Patrick J. Cahill
Case Number: 4:2019cv01631
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ewing Werlein
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Patrick J. Cahill served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019, filed.(Egeland, Susan)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Sara Aswegan, filed.(Egeland, Susan)
May 6, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summon)(hlerma, 4)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/13/2019 at 02:15 PM in Room 11521 before Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 Other EXHIBITS re: #1 Complaint by Sara Aswegan, filed.(Egeland, Susan)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Patrick J. Cahill, filed.(Egeland, Susan)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to John H. Diesel, filed.(Egeland, Susan)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22370107) filed by Sara Aswegan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Egeland, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aswegan v. Diesel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John H. Diesel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick J. Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Aswegan
Represented By: Susan E Egeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?