Johnson County, Texas v. CVS Health Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Johnson County, Texas
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation, Abbott Laboratories, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt PLC, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Actavis PLC, TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industrites, Ltd., Actavis LLC, Allergan PLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Walgreen Boots Alliance, Johnson & Johnson, Walmart Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma, LP, Knoll Pharmaceutical Company and Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01637
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by McKesson Corporation, filed.(Smyser, Craig)
July 1, 2019 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Cardinal Health, Inc., filed.(Mengis, Michael)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #38 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER, re: Walmart Inc's Notice of Intent to File an Opposition Memorandum in response to Johnson County's "Opposition" to Supplemental Notice in Support of Removal (at entry no. 39) The parties' submissions regarding the propriety of remand are currently under consideration by this Court. The Court orders Defendant Walmart Inc. to respond to Plaintiff Johnson County's Response in Opposition to Supplemental Notice in Support of Removal [Doc. No. 37], should it wish to respond, by the end of the day on Monday, July 8, 2019. If Defendant Walmart Inc. chooses to respond, a statement addressing Plaintiff Johnson County's position that the supplemental notice in support of removal is procedurally defective due to the failure to obtain the consent of all defendants would be of assistance to the Court. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
June 27, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Walmart's Intent to File an Opposition Memorandum in Response to Johnson County's "Opposition" to Supplemental Notice in Support of Removal by Walmart Inc., filed. (Durfee, Laura)
June 27, 2019 Filing 38 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move to Dismiss, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Cardinal Health 110 LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mengis, Michael)
June 20, 2019 Filing 37 RESPONSE to #27 Notice (Other) , filed by Johnson County, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dang Return of Service on Citation)(McCarley, Matthew)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER. Defendants Insys Therapeutics, Inc. and Insys Manufacturing LLC, only, are dismissed. The stay is lifted.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(rhawkins)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER STAYING CASE. This case is stayed. All pending motions are MOOT, but may be summarily re-urged if the automatic stay is lifted. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
June 12, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Dismissal as to Insys Manufacturing LLC, Insys Therapeutics, Inc. by Johnson County, Texas, filed. (McCarley, Matthew)
June 11, 2019 Filing 33 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY by Insys Manufacturing LLC, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., filed.(Sarokhanian, Nicholas)
June 10, 2019 Filing 32 BRIEF in Support Mtn to Expedite Remand re: #30 Response in Opposition to Motion by Johnson County, Texas, filed.(McCarley, Matthew)
June 3, 2019 Filing 31 REPLY in Support of #5 MOTION to Stay Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation, filed by CVS Health Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Torian, Mark)
June 3, 2019 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition to #18 MOTION to Expedite Motion to Remand, filed by CVS Health Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Torian, Mark)
June 3, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian A. Wahl on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, filed. (Wahl, Brian)
June 3, 2019 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Endo International plc as Corporate Parent, filed.(Sibiski, Hannah)
May 31, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Removal (Supplemental) by Walmart Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Durfee, Laura)
May 31, 2019 Filing 26 BRIEF in Support re: #18 MOTION to Expedite Motion to Remand by Johnson County, Texas, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(McCarley, Matthew)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time; granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(rhawkins)
May 28, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for John A. McCauley to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Abbott Laboratories, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/18/2019. (sguevara, 4)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Insys to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to the later of: 5 days after a decision by the JPML to not transfer this case to the MDL; 5 days after a decision by the Court on Plaintiffs motion to remand; or June 3, 2019..(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
May 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Sundeep K. Addy to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
May 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Conor B. O'Croinin to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
May 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadlines for named defendant Abbott Laboratories to answer, move to dismiss, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint ( entitled "Plaintiffs Original Petition") is extended to and including five (5) days from the later of: (1) entry of an order by the JPML transferring this case to the Opiate MDL (Case No. 2804); (2) entry of an order with this Court's ruling on Plaintiff's motion to remand; or (3) May 28, 2019..(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
May 24, 2019 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mallinckrodt PLC, filed.(McCleary, Roger)
May 24, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Expedite Motion to Remand by Johnson County, Texas, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McCarley, Matthew)
May 24, 2019 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to answer or otherwise respond to complaint by Abbott Laboratories, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ertas, Alper)
May 24, 2019 Filing 16 BRIEF in Opposition re: #15 Response in Opposition to Motion by Johnson County, Texas, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Proposed Order)(McCarley, Matthew)
May 24, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition to #3 MOTION to Remand, filed by CVS Health Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Torian, Mark)
May 24, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Insys Manufacturing LLC, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sarokhanian, Nicholas)
May 22, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Walmart Inc., filed.(Durfee, Laura)
May 22, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time Answer, Move to Dismiss, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Walmart Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Durfee, Laura)
May 22, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Sundeep K. Addy to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Walmart Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/12/2019. (Durfee, Laura)
May 22, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Conor B. O'Croinin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CVS Health Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/12/2019. (Torian, Mark)
May 21, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by CVS Health Corporation, filed.(Torian, Mark)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industrites, Ltd., Watson Laboratories, Inc., filed.(Patterson, Nancy)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, LP, Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, filed.(Reed, Noelle)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM re: #5 MOTION to Stay Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by CVS Health Corporation, filed.(Torian, Mark)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by CVS Health Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Torian, Mark)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move to Dismiss, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by CVS Health Corporation, Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Torian, Mark)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Remand by Johnson County, Texas, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Memorandum Exhibit A, #3 Memorandum Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order)(McCarley, Matthew)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 152nd District Court, Harris County, case number 2018-63587 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22371688) filed by CVS Health Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Torian, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson County, Texas v. CVS Health Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Mark E Torian
Represented By: Brian Alexander Wahl
Represented By: Conor B. O'Croinin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: Alper T Ertas
Represented By: John A McCauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Hannah DeMarco Sibiski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Represented By: Noelle M Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: David Keith Isaak
Represented By: Craig Smyser
Represented By: Michelle Shamblin Stratton
Represented By: Razvan Ungureanu
Represented By: Tyler G Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Represented By: Brien T O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Noelle M Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas Alex Sarokhanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company
Represented By: Noelle M Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Nancy Lynne Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industrites, Ltd.
Represented By: Nancy Lynne Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Nancy Lynne Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Raley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Nancy Lynne Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Nancy Lynne Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Nancy Lynne Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Boots Alliance
Represented By: Sundeep K Addy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Laura Jane Durfee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Mark E Torian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Hannah DeMarco Sibiski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, LP
Represented By: Noelle M Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knoll Pharmaceutical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnson County, Texas
Represented By: Nabil Majed Nachawati, II
Represented By: Matthew Ryan McCarley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?