Watson v. MP Nexlevel, LLC

Plaintiff: Micah Watson d/b/a Joe's Car Wash and Micah Watson
Defendant: MP Nexlevel, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv01646
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Vanessa D Gilmore
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #4 MOTION to Remand filed by MP Nexlevel, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Schick, Daniel)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 Corrected PROPOSED ORDER re: #4 MOTION to Remand, filed.(Chesney, William)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand by Micah Watson, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chesney, William)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Service in Removed Action by MP Nexlevel, LLC, filed.(Schick, Daniel)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/4/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County Court at Law No. 2, case number 1097475 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22374745) filed by MP Nexlevel, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Schick, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watson v. MP Nexlevel, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micah Watson d/b/a Joe's Car Wash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micah Watson
Represented By: William S Chesney, III
Represented By: Charles Sydney Turet, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MP Nexlevel, LLC
Represented By: Daniel David Schick
Represented By: Branch Masterson Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?