Caldwell v. Mansfield et al
Plaintiff: Morgan Caldwell
Defendant: Big Binder Express, LLC and Melvin Wayne Mansfield
Case Number: 4:2019cv01649
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 Joint JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Big Binder Express, LLC, Melvin Wayne Mansfield, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Volf, Christopher)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 First CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Morgan Caldwell, filed.(Bergquist, David)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 First CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Big Binder Express, LLC, Melvin Wayne Mansfield, filed.(Volf, Christopher)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/9/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 189th Judicial Dist of Harris County, TX, case number 2019-20373 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22375525) filed by Big Binder Express, LLC, Melvin Wayne Mansfield. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Volf, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caldwell v. Mansfield et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Binder Express, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Michael Volf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvin Wayne Mansfield
Represented By: Christopher Michael Volf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan Caldwell
Represented By: David Windlin Bergquist
Represented By: Joshua Patrick Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?