Lacey Newday Consulting, LLC v. Gallagher Benefit Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lacey Newday Consulting, LLC
Defendant: Gallagher Benefit Services, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01678
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Lacey Newday Consulting, LLC, filed.(Massey, Dwaine)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 Supplemental CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Gallagher Benefit Services, Inc., filed.(Ayers, Deanne)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/9/2019 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gallagher Benefit Services, Inc. identifying Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Ayers, Deanne)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE List of All Counsel of Record by Gallagher Benefit Services, Inc., filed. (Ayers, Deanne)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 189th District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 2019-23365 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22384196) filed by Gallagher Benefit Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Certified State Court filings, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 -Certificate of Interested Parties, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Civil Cover Sheet)(Ayers, Deanne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lacey Newday Consulting, LLC v. Gallagher Benefit Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lacey Newday Consulting, LLC
Represented By: Dwaine M Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gallagher Benefit Services, Inc.
Represented By: Deanne C Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?