Polar Pro Filters Inc. v. Frogslayer, LLC
Plaintiff: Polar Pro Filters Inc.
Defendant: Frogslayer, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv01706
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Frogslayer, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pre-Project Report, #2 Exhibit Software Consulting Agreement, #3 Exhibit Statement of Work, #4 Exhibit Project Charter, #5 Exhibit Parties Email Chain, #6 Exhibit Notice Letter, #7 Exhibit Counsel Email Chain)(Holt, Padon)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Stipulation for Extension to Time to Respond; Answer due for Frogslayer, LLC by 6/17/2019. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION re: Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint by Frogslayer, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(West, Gaines)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Frogslayer, LLC served on 5/13/2019, answer due 6/3/2019, filed.(Long, Joshua)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 8/27/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Attachments) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Frogslayer, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Corey M. Weideman on behalf of Polar Pro Filters Inc., filed. (Weideman, Corey)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Polar Pro Filters Inc., filed.(Long, Joshua)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Frogslayer, LLC, filed.(Long, Joshua)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Frogslayer, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22392615) filed by Polar Pro Filters Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Long, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Polar Pro Filters Inc. v. Frogslayer, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frogslayer, LLC
Represented By: Padon David Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Polar Pro Filters Inc.
Represented By: Corey Michael Weideman
Represented By: Joshua B Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?