United States of America v. American Sheet Metal, Inc.
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: American Sheet Metal, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01718
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 29:651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by American Sheet Metal, Inc., filed.(Stergio, Anthony)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order: Initial Conference set for 7/16/2019 at 02:30 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to American Sheet Metal, Inc. served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019, filed.(jguajardo, 4)
May 13, 2019 Summons Issued as to American Sheet Metal, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(SarahShelby, 4)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to American Sheet Metal, Inc., filed.(Lansden, Karen)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Sheet Metal, Inc. filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lansden, Karen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. American Sheet Metal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Sheet Metal, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony G Stergio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Karen Mitchell Lansden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?