Harris County Water Control and Improvement District No. 89 v. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Harris County Water Control and Improvement District No. 89
Defendant: E&M Enterprises, Inc. and Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv01755
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER re: #12 Request for Entry of Default, filed.(Gibson, George)
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST for Entry of Default against E&M Enterprises, Inc. by Harris County Water Control and Improvement District No. 89, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Gibson, George)
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Harris County Water Control and Improvement District No. 89, filed.(Gibson, George)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling and Docket Control Order, filed.(Gibson, George)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Harris County Water Control and Improvement District No. 89, filed.(Gibson, George)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses by Harris County Water Control and Improvement District No. 89, filed. (Gibson, George)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, filed. (Dry, Ryan)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Vacation by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, filed. (Dry, Ryan)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Supplement) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, filed.(Dry, Ryan)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, filed.(Dry, Ryan)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County District Court, case number 2019-24657 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22416150) filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dry, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris County Water Control and Improvement District No. 89 v. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E&M Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Ryan Dodson Dry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harris County Water Control and Improvement District No. 89
Represented By: George R Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?